Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1493135

EP1493135 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING ASSETS USING A PORTABLE COMBINED ELECTRONIC ARTICLE SURVEILLANCE SYSTEM AND BARCODE SCANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.06.2007
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sensormatic Electronics, LLC
6600 Congress Avenue
Boca Raton, FL 33487 / US
[2018/50]
Former [2013/33]For all designated states
Tyco Fire & Security GmbH
Victor von Bruns-Strasse 21
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
Former [2011/13]For all designated states
Sensormatic Electronics, LLC
One Town Center Road
Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
Sensormatic Electronics Corporation
6600 Congress Avenue
Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CANIPE, Larry
3342 NW 28th Terrace
Boca Raton, FL 33434 / US
02 / LEONE, Steven V
6665 Blue Bay Circle
Lake Worth, FL 33467 / US
 [2005/01]
Representative(s)Hafner & Kohl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Schleiermacherstraße 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/16]Hafner, Dieter , et al
Hafner & Partner Patent-/Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schleiermacherstrasse 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2008/34]Hafner, Dieter , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2005/27]Hafner, Dieter, Dr. , et al
Hafner & Partner GbR Patent-/Rechtsanwälte Schleiermacherstrasse 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2005/01]Hafner, Dieter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Hafner & Stippl, Patentanwälte, Schleiermacherstrasse 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date03724161.911.04.2003
[2005/01]
WO2003US12444
Priority number, dateUS20020372016P11.04.2002         Original published format: US 372016 P
[2005/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03088006
Date:23.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1493135
Date:05.01.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003
[2005/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.02.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2006
ClassificationInternational:G08B13/24
[2006/23]
Former International [2005/01]G08B13/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON KAPITAL UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES TRAGBAREN KOMBINIERTEN ELEKTRONISCHEN ARTIKELSICHERUNGSSYSTEMS UND STRICHCODE-SCANNERS[2005/01]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING ASSETS USING A PORTABLE COMBINED ELECTRONIC ARTICLE SURVEILLANCE SYSTEM AND BARCODE SCANNER[2005/01]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE GESTION DE BIENS UTILISANT UN SYSTEME ELECTRONIQUE DE SURVEILLANCE D'ARTICLES COMBINE, PORTABLE ET UN SCANNEUR DE CODES-BARRES[2005/01]
Entry into regional phase13.10.2004National basic fee paid 
13.10.2004Search fee paid 
13.10.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.2004Examination requested  [2005/01]
20.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
11.05.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
09.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination24.07.2015Appeal received No.  T2131/15
08.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.10.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[X]US6102290  (SWARTZ ET AL) [X] 1-30 * abstract * * column 1, line 24 - column 4, line 43 * * column 5, lines 47-57 * * column 8, lines 24-46 * * column 10, line 28 - column 11, line 10 * * column 11, lines 41-62 * * column 18, line 59 - column 22, line 55 * * column 24, line 51 - column 25, line 16 * * figures 9b,11b,12b *;
 [X]US5151684  (JOHNSEN ET AL) [X] 1-30 * abstract * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 50 * * column 4, lines 22-44 * * column 5, lines 11-19 * * column 5, lines 62-65 * * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 26 * * column 11, lines 49-65 *;
 [A]US5059951  (KALTNER ET AL) [A] 1-4,15,23,29 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-60 * * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 14 *
International search[X]US5151684  ;
 [Y]US5979757