Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1466047

EP1466047 - WASHING MACHINE AND DRYER HAVING TILTED DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.03.2008
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 15.01.2020 [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2008/18]For all designated states
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Former [2004/42]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Jong Seok
Dongsung Apt. 115-2301, Sapa-dong
Changwon-shi, 641-550 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
02 / NO, Yang Hwan
Sungwon 1st Apt. 102-1005, Namyang-dong
Changwon-shi, 641-091 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
03 / CHO, Han Ki
Sungwon Apt. 2-204, Daewon-dong
Changwon-shi, 641-200 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
04 / JUNG, Yeon Su
LG Dormitory A-406, Kaumchong-dong
Changwon-shi, 641-110 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
05 / KANG, Jung Hoon
Ducksan 1-cha APT. 101-408 Daebang-dong
Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do 641-758 / KR
06 / PARK, Myung Sik
Sangnam Apt. 22-7, Sapa-dong
Changwon-shi, 641-550 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
07 / HA, Young Hoon
Kyowon-dong 16-1, Happo-gu
Masan-shi, 631-100 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
 [2006/11]
Former [2005/04]01 / KIM, Jong Seok
Dongsung Apt. 115-2301, Sapa-dong
Changwon-shi, 641-550 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
02 / NO, Yang Hwan
Sungwon 1st Apt. 102-1005, Namyang-dong
Changwon-shi, 641-091 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
03 / CHO, Han Ki
Sungwon Apt. 2-204, Daewon-dong
Changwon-shi, 641-200 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
04 / JUNG, Yeon Su
LG Dormitory A-406, Kaumchong-dong
Changwon-shi, 641-110 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
05 / KANG, Jung Hoon
Lucky APT., 3-1310 Banlim-dong
Changwon-si, Kyongsangnam-do / KR
06 / PARK, Myung Sik
Sangnam Apt. 22-7, Sapa-dong
Changwon-shi, 641-550 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
07 / HA, Young Hoon
Kyowon-dong 16-1, Happo-gu
Masan-shi, 631-100 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
Former [2004/42]01 / KIM, Jong Seok
Dongsung Apt. 115-2301, Sapa-dong
Changwon-shi, 641-550 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
02 / NO, Yang Hwan
Sungwon 1st Apt. 102-1005, Namyang-dong
Changwon-shi, 641-091 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
03 / CHO, Han Ki
Sungwon Apt. 2-204, Daewon-dong
Changwon-shi, 641-200 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
04 / JUNG, Yeon Su
LG Dormitory A-406, Kaumchong-dong
Changwon-shi, 641-110 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
05 / KANG, Jung Hoon
LG Dormitory A-211, Kaumchong-dong 391-12
Changwon-shi, 641-110 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
06 / PARK, Myung Sik
Sangnam Apt. 22-7, Sapa-dong
Changwon-shi, 641-550 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
07 / HA, Young Hoon
Kyowon-dong 16-1, Happo-gu
Masan-shi, 631-100 Kyongsangnam-do / KR
Representative(s)Smith, Jeremy Robert , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/42]Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date03729560.717.01.2003
[2004/42]
WO2003KR00108
Priority number, dateKR2002000268817.01.2002         Original published format: KR 2002002688
[2004/42]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03060224
Date:24.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1466047
Date:13.10.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003
[2004/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1466047
Date:30.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT24.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:D06F37/18
[2004/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2008/18]
Former [2004/42]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
TitleGerman:WASCHTROCKNER MIT GENEIGT ANGEORDNETER TÜR[2004/42]
English:WASHING MACHINE AND DRYER HAVING TILTED DOOR[2004/42]
French:LAVE-LINGE ET SECHE-LINGE EQUIPES D'UNE PORTE INCLINEE[2004/42]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2003Translation filed 
16.09.2003National basic fee paid 
16.09.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.2003Examination requested  [2004/42]
14.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2008Fee for grant paid
03.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.01.2009  12.02.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Miele & Cie. KG Schutzrechte/Verträge
Carl-Miele-Strasse 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
 02  30.01.2009  24.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
BSH Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
 [2015/16]
Former [2009/12]
Opponent(s)01  30.01.2009  12.02.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Miele & Cie. KG Schutzrechte/Verträge
Carl-Miele-Strasse 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
 02  30.01.2009   
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Str. 34
81739 München / DE
27.03.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.11.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.11.2009Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2010Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
16.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
12.01.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.01.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition11.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0661/16
23.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
07.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
13.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200503   M06   Fee paid on   07.04.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB17.01.2019
[2020/03]
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1116812