Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1514380

EP1514380 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOCATING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  03.07.2009
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 05.08.2009  [2009/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/11]For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / ROBINSON, David, Peter
16 CHRISTCHURCH STREET
IPSWICH, Suffolk IP4 2DJ / GB
02 / MARSHALL, Ian, William
6 PUMP CLOSE, BREDFIELD
WOODBRIDGE, Suffolk IP13 6DD / GB
 [2005/11]
Representative(s)Williamson, Simeon Paul , et al
BT Intellectual Property Department
Ground Floor
BT Faraday Building
1 Knightrider Street
London EC4V 5BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/11]Williamson, Simeon , et al
BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department, PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street
London, EC1A 7AJ / GB
Application number, filing date03730370.818.06.2003
[2005/11]
WO2003GB02608
Priority number, dateEP2002025424318.06.2002         Original published format: EP 02254243
EP2002025525526.07.2002         Original published format: EP 02255255
[2005/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03107595
Date:24.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1514380
Date:16.03.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003
[2005/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, G01S5/02
[2005/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/40]
Former [2005/11]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM LOKALISIEREN VON GERÄTEN[2005/11]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOCATING DEVICES[2005/11]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE LOCALISER DES DISPOSITIFS[2005/11]
Entry into regional phase23.12.2004National basic fee paid 
23.12.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/11]
17.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
01.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
11.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
15.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1039689  (ROCKWELL SCIENCE CENTER LLC) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 54 * * column 4, line 11 - line 40 * * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 10 * * column 7, line 24 - line 54 * * column 9, line 34 - column 10, line 37 * * column 12, line 38 - column 13, line 8 * * column 17, line 48 - column 21, line 4 * * column 28, line 20 - line 53 *
 [XAY]  - SAVARESE C ET AL, "Robust Positioning Algorithms for Distributed Ad-Hoc Wireless Sensor Networks", USENIX TECHNICAL CONFERENCE, XX, XX, (200106), pages 317 - 327, XP002225742 [X] 1-4,7-9 * page 317, column L, line 17 - page 319, column L, line 23 * * page 320, column L, line 28 - page 321, column R, line 9 * * page 322, column R, line 31 - page 323, column R, line 11 * [A] 6 [Y] 5
 [YA]  - SAVARESE C ET AL, "Location in distributed ad-hoc wireless sensor networks", 2001 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP). SALT LAKE CITY, UT, MAY 7 - 11, 2001, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (20010507), vol. 4 OF 6, ISBN 0-7803-7041-4, pages 2037 - 2040, XP002225743 [Y] 5 * page 2038, column R, line 14 - page 2039, column L, line 18 * * page 2040, column L, line 23 - column R, line 10 * [A] 1,7-9

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2001.940391