Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1499182

EP1499182 - HUMAN CHRONIC LYMPHOCYTIC LEUKEMIA MODELED IN MOUSE BY TARGETED TCL1 EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.09.2010
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY
1020 Locust Street, Suite M-34
Philadelphia, PA 19107 / US
[2009/52]
Former [2009/37]For all designated states
THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY
1020 Locust Street
Philadelphia, PA 19107-6799 / US
Former [2005/04]For all designated states
Thomas Jefferson University
Suite 630, 1020 Walnut Street
Philadelphia, PA 19107 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CROCE, Carlo, M.
1829 Delancy Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US
 [2005/04]
Representative(s)Main, Malcolm Charles , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/04]Main, Malcolm Charles , et al
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date03731057.029.04.2003
[2005/04]
WO2003US13306
Priority number, dateUS20020376464P29.04.2002         Original published format: US 376464 P
[2005/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03092370
Date:13.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1499182
Date:26.01.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2003
[2005/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1499182
Date:28.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.11.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:A01K67/00, A01K67/027, C07K14/82
[2007/37]
Former International [2005/04]A01K67/00, A01K67/027
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/04]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HUMANE CHRONISCHE LYMPHOZYTISCHE LEUKÄMIE IM MAUSMODELL DURCH GEZIELTE EXPRESSION VON TCL1[2005/04]
English:HUMAN CHRONIC LYMPHOCYTIC LEUKEMIA MODELED IN MOUSE BY TARGETED TCL1 EXPRESSION[2005/04]
French:LA LEUCEMIE LYMPHOCYTAIRE CHRONIQUE HUMAINE MODELISEE DANS LA SOURIS PAR L'EXPRESSION CIBLEE DE LA LEUCEMIE LYMPHOCYTAIRE 1 (TCL1)[2005/04]
Entry into regional phase09.11.2004National basic fee paid 
09.11.2004Search fee paid 
09.11.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.11.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2004Examination requested  [2005/04]
25.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2009Fee for grant paid
21.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
CZ28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IT28.10.2009
NL28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
SK28.10.2009
TR28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
HU29.04.2010
IE29.04.2010
LU29.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
CZ28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IT28.10.2009
NL28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
SK28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
HU29.04.2010
IE29.04.2010
LU29.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2012/43]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
CZ28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IT28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
SK28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
HU29.04.2010
IE29.04.2010
LU29.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2012/42]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
CZ28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IT28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
SK28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
HU29.04.2010
IE29.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2011/14]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
CZ28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IT28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
SK28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
IE29.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2011/07]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
CZ28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
SK28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
IE29.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2010/50]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
CZ28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
SK28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2010/48]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
CZ28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
SK28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/39]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
CZ28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
SK28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/36]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
CZ28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/35]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/29]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/25]CY28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/23]FI28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/22]FI28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
ES08.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/19]ES08.02.2010
Documents cited:Search[Y]  TAKIZAWA JUN ET AL, "Expression of the TCL1 gene at 14q32 in B-cell malignancies but not in adult T-cell leukemia", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF CANCER RESEARCH, (199807), vol. 89, no. 7, ISSN 0910-5050, pages 712 - 718, XP002445139 [Y] 1,4,7,9-12 * the whole document *
 [Y]  NAKAYAMA ICHIRO ET AL, "Activation of the TCL1 protein in B cell lymphomas", PATHOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, (200003), vol. 50, no. 3, ISSN 1320-5463, pages 191 - 199, XP002445140 [Y] 1,4,7,9-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1440-1827.2000.01023.x
 [Y]  HOYER KATRINA K ET AL, "TCL1 oncogene-induced B-cell neoplasia: A role for antigen receptor activation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL MEETING, & 93RD ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH; SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA, USA; APRIL 06-10, 2002, (200203), vol. 43, ISSN 0197-016X, page 281, XP001536628 [Y] 1,4,7,9-12 * the whole document *
 [PY]  HOYER KATRINA K ET AL, "Dysregulated TCL1 promotes multiple classes of mature B cell lymphoma.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20021029), vol. 99, no. 22, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 14392 - 14397, XP002445142 [PY] 1,4,7,9-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.212410199
International search[Y]  - VIRGILIO ET AL., "Deregulated expression of TCL1 causes T cell leukemia in mice", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (199803), vol. 95, pages 3885 - 3889, XP002941172

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.7.3885
 [Y]  - NARDUCCI ET AL., "Regulation of TCL1 expression in B- and T-cell lymphomas and reactive lymphoid tissues", CANCER RESEARCH, (20000415), vol. 60, pages 2005 - 2100, XP002971503
 [A]  - BICHI ET AL., "Human chronic lymphocytic leukemia modeled in mouse by targeted TCL1 expression", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (20020514), vol. 99, no. 10, pages 6955 - 6960, XP002971504

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.102181599
Examination   SHAW A.C. ET AL, "Activated Ras signals developmental progression of recombinase-activating gene (RAG)-deficient pro-B lymphcytes", J. EXP. MED., (19990104), vol. 189, no. 1, pages 123 - 129,
by applicantUS4870009
 US5550316
 US4736866
 US4873191
 WO8800239
 WO9005188
 WO9211757