Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1511978

EP1511978 - METHHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SENSING AND ANALYZING A WAVEFRONT OF AN OPTICALLY TRANSMISSIVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.04.2014
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
30.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AMO WaveFront Sciences, LLC
14810 Central Avenue, SE
Albuquerque, NM 87123 / US
[2008/14]
Former [2005/10]For all designated states
Wavefront Sciences Inc.
14810 Central Avenue, SE
Albuquerque, MN 87123 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NEAL, Daniel, R.
17 Eric Alan Lane
Tijeras, NM 87059 / US
02 / COPLAND, Richard, J.
1625 Harvard Drive, NE
Albuquerque, NM 87106 / US
03 / RAMMAGE, Ron, R.
14 Imnaha Road
Tijeras, NM 87059 / US
04 / TOPA, Daniel, M.
13150 Wenonah Avenue, SE
Albuquerque, NM 87123-3905 / US
05 / HAMRICK, Daniel, R.
P.O. Box 975
Cedar Crest, NM 87008 / US
 [2005/10]
Representative(s)Wynne-Jones IP Limited
2nd Floor, 5210 Valiant Court
Gloucester Business Park
Gloucester
Gloucestershire GL3 4FE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/39]Jones, Ithel Rhys , et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP
Essex Place
22, Rodney Road
Cheltenham GL50 1JJ / GB
Former [2005/10]Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles , et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road
Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
Application number, filing date03731448.130.05.2003
[2005/10]
WO2003US16972
Priority number, dateUS20020384082P31.05.2002         Original published format: US 384082 P
[2005/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03102519
Date:11.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1511978
Date:09.03.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003
[2005/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.12.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01J1/00, G01B9/00, G02B17/06, G02B27/02, G02B27/30
[2005/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2005/38]
Former [2005/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ERFASSEN UND ANALYSIEREN EINER WELLENFRONT EINES OPTISCH DURCHLÄSSIGEN SYSTEMS[2005/10]
English:METHHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SENSING AND ANALYZING A WAVEFRONT OF AN OPTICALLY TRANSMISSIVE SYSTEM[2005/10]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE DETECTION ET D'ANALYSE DU FRONT D'ONDE D'UN SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION OPTIQUE[2005/10]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2004National basic fee paid 
14.12.2004Search fee paid 
14.12.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/10]
20.12.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.04.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
21.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination20.02.2017Appeal received No.  T1486/17
02.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
03.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.11.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
19.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
05.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
10.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9966308  (OPTIKOS CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, lines 5-8 * * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 11 * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 2 * * page 8, lines 20-30 * * page 9, lines 11-28 * * page 10, line 30 - page 12, line 10 * * page 25, lines 6-18 *
International search[A]US5289254  (BRAUNECKER BERNHARD [CH], et al);
 [A]US5629765  (SCHMUTZ LAWRENCE E [US]);
 [A]US5841125  (LIVINGSTON PETER M [US]);
 [A]US5978053  (GILES MICHAEL K [US], et al);
 [AE]US6575572  (LAI MING [US], et al);
 [AP]US6550917  (NEAL DANIEL R [US], et al)
by applicantWO9966308