Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1472447 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1120
17.11.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
09.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.11.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
06.11.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 9
06.11.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.11.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
31.10.2017 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
30.10.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.10.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.10.2017 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
27.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.09.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.09.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
11.09.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
08.09.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
07.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.09.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
01.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
01.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
29.08.2017 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
24.08.2017 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
14.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.08.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
01.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.08.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
01.08.2017 Authorisation of representative Appeal 2
01.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.08.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
24.07.2017 Request for a change of address - opponent Search / examination 12
01.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.05.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
04.05.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
03.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.05.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.05.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
02.05.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
25.04.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
24.04.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
06.04.2017 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
06.04.2017 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
06.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.03.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
08.03.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 17
08.03.2017 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 8
19.07.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
19.07.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 31
11.07.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 31
11.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
08.02.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 16
02.02.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 16
10.11.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
24.04.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
17.04.2015 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
16.09.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
12.08.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.12.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.11.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 8
09.10.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
09.10.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
24.09.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
11.06.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
07.06.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.05.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.05.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 30
23.05.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
23.05.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
23.05.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
23.05.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
23.05.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
21.05.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
28.03.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
28.03.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
19.03.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
19.03.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
18.03.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.03.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
18.03.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
20.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.02.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
08.02.2013 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
06.02.2013 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
05.02.2013 Request for change of name -opponent Search / examination 1
04.02.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
24.01.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
24.01.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.01.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.01.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.01.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.01.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
18.01.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
18.01.2013 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 16
18.01.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
18.01.2013 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
18.01.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.01.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.01.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
18.01.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
18.01.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.01.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
20.11.2012 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
20.11.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 9
14.11.2012 Claims Opposition 5
14.11.2012 Claims Opposition 5
14.11.2012 Claims Opposition 5
14.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
02.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
26.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
26.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
26.10.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
25.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.10.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.10.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.06.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.06.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.06.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
13.06.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
13.06.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.06.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
25.05.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.01.2011 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
14.01.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant Search / examination 1
25.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.06.2008 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
29.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2008 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
15.04.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
07.04.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
14.03.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
10.03.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.03.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
31.01.2008 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
04.10.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.10.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
15.06.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
06.06.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 11
06.06.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 53
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
06.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
03.11.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.09.2006 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
13.09.2006 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
31.08.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
31.08.2006 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
31.08.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
31.08.2006 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
23.08.2006 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 11
05.05.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
05.05.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.05.2006 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.05.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 29
04.11.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
04.11.2004 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
15.10.2004 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
01.10.2004 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
22.09.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.09.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.09.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.09.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.09.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.07.2004 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
15.07.2004 Annex Search / examination 1
15.07.2004 Annex Search / examination 1
15.07.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.06.2004 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
18.06.2004 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
07.06.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
27.05.2004 Notification of the recording of a change PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.05.2004 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
19.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
19.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 3
10.05.2004 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
10.05.2004 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.05.2004 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.05.2004 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.05.2004 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.05.2004 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
10.05.2004 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
10.05.2004 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.05.2004 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.12.2003 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
12.12.2003 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
12.12.2003 Description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.12.2003 Description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.12.2003 Document concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.12.2003 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
06.11.2003 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.11.2003 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.11.2003 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
31.07.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
31.07.2003 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 31
28.07.2003 Notification of the recording of a change PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
01.07.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.06.2003 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.06.2003 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.06.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.06.2003 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.05.2003 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.05.2003 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
11.02.2003 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
28.01.2003 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
28.01.2003 Claims International Searching Authority 4
28.01.2003 Description International Searching Authority 20
28.01.2003 Drawings International Searching Authority 5