Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1666153

EP1666153 - A ADJUSTABLE GAS-LIQUID CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR AND SEPARATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.06.2011
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.07.2011  [2011/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Haimo Technologies Inc.
593, Zhangsutan Chengguan District Lanzhou
Gansu 730010 / CN
[2010/52]
Former [2006/23]For all designated states
Haimo Technologies Inc.
66 Minle Road Lanzhou
Gansu 730050 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / DOU, Jianwen
19/E, Taisheng Plaza, 61 Zhangye Road
Lanzhou, Gansu 730030 / CN
02 / WAN, Jinsong
66 Minle Road
Lanzhou, Gansu 730050 / CN
03 / ZHANG, Ligang
66 Minle Road
Lanzhou, Gansu 730050 / CN
 [2006/23]
Representative(s)Bernhardt, Reinhold , et al
Patentanwälte Bernhardt/Wolff
Partnerschaft mbB
Europaallee 17
66113 Saarbrücken / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/23]Bernhardt, Reinold , et al
Kobenhüttenweg 43
66123 Saarbrücken / DE
Application number, filing date03732174.216.05.2003
[2006/23]
WO2003CN00360
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004101161
Date:25.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1666153
Date:07.06.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004
[2006/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1666153
Date:28.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN25.11.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:B04C5/00, B01D19/00, B04C11/00, E21B43/34
[2006/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/34]
Former [2006/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERSTELLBARER GAS-FLÜSSIGKEITSZENTRIFUGALABSCHEIDER UND ABSCHEIDUNGSVERFAHREN[2006/23]
English:A ADJUSTABLE GAS-LIQUID CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR AND SEPARATING METHOD[2006/23]
French:SEPARATEUR CENTRIFUGE GAZ-LIQUIDE REGLABLE ET PROCEDE DE SEPARATION[2006/23]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2005Translation filed 
09.12.2005National basic fee paid 
29.03.2006Search fee paid 
09.12.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/23]
10.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
11.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2010Fee for grant paid
11.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.04.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
24.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
04.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
07.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4852395  (KOLPAK MIROSLAV M [US]) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, line 7 - line 13 * * column 1, line 30 - line 50 * * column 3, line 1 - column 11, line 4 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]US4881412  (NORTHEDGE RONALD [GB]) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, line 8 - line 22 * * column 2, line 40 - line 43 * * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 40 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]DE19926388  (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *
International search[A]US4852395  (KOLPAK MIROSLAV M [US]);
 [A]US4424068  (MCMILLAN JOHN F [US]);
 [A]CN1072609  (PROSPECTING DESIGN INST HENAN [CN]);
 [A]CN2458523Y  (ZHOU KANGWEI [CN]);
 [A]CN2348358Y  (MEIYI SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY D [CN]);
 [A]CN2455329Y  (EXPLORATION AND DESIGN INST OF [CN]);
 [A]CN1130235  (DRILLING AND PRODUCTION TECH I [CN])
by applicantUS4853395