Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1511677 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1511677



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2081
13.01.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
23.11.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
12.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.11.2010 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
09.09.2010 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
09.09.2010 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
09.09.2010 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
09.09.2010 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
03.09.2010 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
25.08.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
25.08.2010 French translation of claims Opposition 4
25.08.2010 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
25.08.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
04.06.2010 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
04.06.2010 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
04.06.2010 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
04.06.2010 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
04.06.2010 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
28.05.2010 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
27.05.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.05.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.05.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
14.05.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
14.05.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
12.05.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.05.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.04.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
29.04.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 42
17.02.2010 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 7
09.02.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
05.02.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
14.01.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
13.01.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
11.01.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
11.01.2010 Claims Appeal 11
11.01.2010 Claims Appeal 9
11.01.2010 Claims Appeal 11
11.01.2010 Claims Appeal 10
11.01.2010 Claims Appeal 10
11.01.2010 Claims Appeal 10
11.01.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 12
11.01.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 12
11.01.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.01.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
30.11.2009 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 12
27.11.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.11.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.11.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
17.11.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.11.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
06.11.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
31.10.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.10.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
28.10.2009 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 8
23.10.2009 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
17.09.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
11.09.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.09.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.09.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
08.09.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
27.08.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
27.08.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
27.08.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
27.08.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 270
27.08.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 270
27.08.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.08.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
28.07.2009 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 5
01.07.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
26.06.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
26.06.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 25
25.06.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Appeal 2
25.06.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
25.06.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
25.06.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.06.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.06.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.06.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.06.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
25.06.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.06.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
25.06.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.02.2009 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.02.2009 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 3
26.02.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
19.02.2009 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
18.02.2009 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.02.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 37
18.02.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 22
06.02.2009 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.02.2009 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.02.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
06.02.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 55
06.02.2009 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
06.02.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
26.01.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
22.01.2009 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
13.01.2009 Refund of fees Appeal 1
23.12.2008 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
17.12.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 5
11.12.2008 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
08.12.2008 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
04.12.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
24.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.10.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.10.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
08.10.2008 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
08.10.2008 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 17
08.10.2008 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
08.10.2008 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
08.10.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.10.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.10.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
08.10.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
08.10.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.10.2008 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2008 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
03.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
03.07.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
03.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.06.2008 Claims Opposition 16
30.06.2008 Claims Opposition 15
30.06.2008 Claims Opposition 3
30.06.2008 Claims Opposition 7
30.06.2008 Communication concerning deficiencies in subsequently filed documents Opposition 2
30.06.2008 Description Opposition 1
30.06.2008 Drawings Opposition 1
30.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
30.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
30.06.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
30.06.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
30.06.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.06.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
19.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.06.2008 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
13.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.04.2008 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
30.04.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.04.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.04.2008 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
22.04.2008 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
14.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.03.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.03.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.03.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.02.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.02.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
22.02.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.02.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.09.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2007 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
08.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
24.07.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
23.07.2007 Request for change of address Opposition 1
18.07.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 3
30.03.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
30.03.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.03.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.03.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.03.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.03.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.02.2007 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
23.02.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 20
23.02.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 33
23.02.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.02.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
23.02.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
23.02.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.02.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
23.02.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
23.02.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
23.02.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
23.02.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
23.02.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.02.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.02.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
22.02.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 22
24.01.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
17.01.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.01.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 15
10.01.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
10.01.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
10.01.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.01.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
29.12.2006 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 29
13.04.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.03.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.03.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
21.03.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
21.03.2006 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.02.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
17.02.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.02.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
31.01.2006 Preparation of grant Search / examination 1
02.11.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
10.10.2005 Request for change of name Search / examination 7
06.09.2005 Claims Search / examination 3
06.09.2005 Description Search / examination 9
06.09.2005 Drawings Search / examination 2
06.09.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.07.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
28.07.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.01.2005 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.01.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
03.12.2004 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
02.12.2004 Notification of the recording of a change PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.11.2004 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
29.11.2004 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
29.11.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
24.11.2004 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
23.11.2004 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
23.11.2004 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
23.11.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
25.10.2004 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.10.2004 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.10.2004 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
25.10.2004 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
25.10.2004 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
25.10.2004 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
25.10.2004 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.10.2004 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.10.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
24.06.2004 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.06.2004 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
24.06.2004 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
10.06.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 44
01.03.2004 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.02.2004 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.02.2004 Refund of fees (PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.02.2004 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.02.2004 Written opinion - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
12.02.2004 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.02.2004 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.01.2004 Invitation to pay prescribed fees together with late payment fee (Rule 58bis PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.01.2004 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.01.2004 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.01.2004 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.01.2004 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.01.2004 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
09.01.2004 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.01.2004 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.01.2004 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
18.12.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
18.12.2003 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 48
10.07.2003 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
18.06.2003 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
18.06.2003 Claims International Searching Authority 15
18.06.2003 Description International Searching Authority 27
18.06.2003 Drawings International Searching Authority 5