blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1502483 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1502483



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2183
18.04.2019 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 3
18.04.2019 Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 19
15.04.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
04.03.2019 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
04.03.2019 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
04.03.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during review procedure Appeal 2
21.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.01.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during review procedure Appeal 12
21.01.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during review procedure Appeal 1
02.11.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.10.2018 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
17.10.2018 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
11.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.10.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 1
11.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.10.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during review procedure Appeal 2
01.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.09.2018 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 2
27.09.2018 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal during review procedure Appeal 12
20.09.2018 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
04.05.2018 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
04.05.2018 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
30.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 3
30.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 3
30.04.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
30.04.2018 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
24.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.04.2018 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 1
24.04.2018 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 11
23.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.04.2018 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
23.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
23.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.04.2018 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 11
23.04.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
09.04.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.03.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
12.03.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.02.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 25
14.02.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.02.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.02.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 32
24.10.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
24.10.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
24.10.2017 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 4
19.10.2017 General authorisation Appeal 3
19.10.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.09.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 19
19.09.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 19
19.09.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 19
15.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
11.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
11.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
08.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
08.09.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
05.09.2017 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
30.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.08.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
20.07.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.07.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
14.07.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
14.07.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.07.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
14.07.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
14.07.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
14.07.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
08.06.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
17.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.05.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
12.05.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
04.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.05.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 3
02.05.2017 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 2
02.05.2017 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 2
02.05.2017 F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation Appeal 3
02.05.2017 F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation Appeal 3
13.04.2017 Communication about missing advise for delivery Appeal 1
28.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.03.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
14.03.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
14.03.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
14.03.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
09.03.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
06.03.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
12.01.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
12.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.12.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 31
21.12.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 8
21.12.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.12.2016 Intervention of the assumed infringer Appeal 16
21.12.2016 Intervention of the assumed infringer Appeal 2
21.12.2016 Intervention of the assumed infringer Appeal 6
21.12.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
21.12.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
21.12.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
21.12.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
21.12.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.12.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
21.12.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 41
21.12.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.10.2016 Document concerning representation Appeal 3
12.10.2016 Document concerning representation Appeal 3
12.02.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Appeal 1
10.02.2016 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 33
09.02.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
02.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
28.12.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 37
22.12.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 37
07.12.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Appeal 1
03.12.2015 Document concerning representation Appeal 2
13.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
07.10.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 8
30.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.09.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
31.08.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 2
31.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
31.08.2015 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 1
17.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.08.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.06.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
25.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.06.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.06.2015 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
12.06.2015 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
08.06.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
08.06.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.06.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
01.06.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
29.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
29.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 9
29.05.2015 Amended description with annotations Appeal 3
29.05.2015 Claims Appeal 9
29.05.2015 Description Appeal 3
29.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
29.05.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
20.05.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
10.04.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
10.04.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
31.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.03.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
31.03.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
31.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
31.03.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
20.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.03.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
20.03.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
03.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.01.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
21.01.2015 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 38
21.01.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 14
21.01.2015 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.01.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.01.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
07.01.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
07.01.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
07.01.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
07.01.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
07.01.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.01.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 9
07.01.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 9
07.01.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.01.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
21.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.10.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 9
16.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 24
16.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
16.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.10.2014 Claims Opposition 9
16.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
16.10.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.10.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
13.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
10.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.10.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.09.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Opposition 1
23.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2014 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Opposition 1
17.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
17.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
17.09.2014 Observations by third parties Opposition 17
17.09.2014 Patent document filed by a Third party Opposition 16
17.09.2014 Patent document filed by a Third party Opposition 6
11.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
04.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 9
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 9
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 9
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 9
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 9
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 9
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 9
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 9
04.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.09.2014 Claims Opposition 9
04.09.2014 Claims Opposition 9
04.09.2014 Claims Opposition 9
04.09.2014 Claims Opposition 6
04.09.2014 Claims Opposition 9
04.09.2014 Claims Opposition 9
04.09.2014 Claims Opposition 9
04.09.2014 Claims Opposition 9
04.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
04.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
04.09.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.09.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.06.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.06.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.06.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.06.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 14
17.06.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.06.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.06.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
09.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
09.05.2014 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Opposition 4
13.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.02.2014 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Opposition 1
05.02.2014 Citation filed by a third party Opposition 59
05.02.2014 Citation filed by a third party Opposition 31
05.02.2014 Citation filed by a third party Opposition 4
05.02.2014 Citation filed by a third party Opposition 16
05.02.2014 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 22
05.02.2014 Observations by third parties Opposition 12
05.02.2014 Observations by third parties Opposition 2
14.11.2013 Document concerning representation Opposition 60
13.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.09.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
03.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
28.08.2013 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 16
02.05.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 12
02.05.2013 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
02.05.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.02.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
03.02.2012 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 8
15.12.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
05.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.12.2011 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.07.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
26.07.2011 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
26.07.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.07.2011 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
22.07.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
02.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.06.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.06.2010 Claims Opposition 9
24.06.2010 Claims Opposition 9
24.06.2010 Claims Opposition 9
24.06.2010 Claims Opposition 9
24.06.2010 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
24.06.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.06.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.06.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 28
24.06.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
28.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.04.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
23.04.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.04.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.04.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.12.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.12.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
13.10.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
03.09.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.09.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.09.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 168
03.09.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
03.09.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.09.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
03.09.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
03.09.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
06.11.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.10.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.10.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 9
14.10.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 10
14.10.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.09.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
16.09.2008 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
09.09.2008 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 6
18.06.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
18.06.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
18.06.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
18.06.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 54
04.12.2007 Description Search / examination 3
04.12.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.10.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
22.10.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.04.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
30.04.2007 Description Search / examination 2
30.04.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
30.04.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.02.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
28.02.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 9
17.10.2006 Description Search / examination 2
17.10.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.09.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
18.08.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.08.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.07.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.07.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.07.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.07.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
05.07.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
10.04.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.04.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.12.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.12.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
21.10.2004 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 9
21.10.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
21.10.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
24.09.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
28.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
28.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 12
15.01.2004 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
20.11.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
20.11.2003 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 56
22.09.2003 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
12.06.2003 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
12.06.2003 Claims International Searching Authority 11
12.06.2003 Description International Searching Authority 34
12.06.2003 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
12.06.2003 Drawings International Searching Authority 11