Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1508205

EP1508205 - DISPATCH SERVICE ARCHITECTURE FRAMEWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.11.2011
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.12.2011  [2011/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kodiak Networks, Inc.
2010 Crow Canyon Place, Suite 270
San Ramon, CA 94583 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/08]For all designated states
Kodiak Networks, Inc.
2010 Crow Canyon Place, Suite 270
San Ramon, CA 94583 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KUNDU, Gorachand
1501 10th Street, Suite 130
Plano, TX 75074 / US
02 / AYYASAMY, Ravi
3400 Waterview Parkway, Suite 107
Richardson, TX 75080 / US
03 / PATEL, Krishnakant
4613 Deer Valley Lane
Richardson, TX 75082 / US
 [2005/21]
Former [2005/08]01 / KUNDU, Gorachand
19251 Preston Road
Dallas, TX 75252 / US
02 / AYYASAMY, Ravi
6565 McCallum Road
Dallas, TX 75252 / US
03 / PATEL, Krishnakant
4613 Deer Valley Lane
Richardson, TX 75082 / US
Representative(s)Leeming, John Gerard
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/08]Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date03736702.623.05.2003
[2005/08]
WO2003US16386
Priority number, dateUS20020382981P24.05.2002         Original published format: US 382981 P
US20020383179P24.05.2002         Original published format: US 383179 P
US20020407168P30.08.2002         Original published format: US 407168 P
[2005/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03101007
Date:04.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1508205
Date:23.02.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003
[2005/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.12.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/00, H04Q7/20
[2005/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DISPATCH-DIENSTARCHITEKTURRAHMEN[2005/08]
English:DISPATCH SERVICE ARCHITECTURE FRAMEWORK[2005/08]
French:CADRE D'ARCHITECTURE DE SERVICES DE DISTRIBUTION[2005/08]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2004National basic fee paid 
22.11.2004Search fee paid 
22.11.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.11.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2004Examination requested  [2005/08]
27.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.07.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/52]
10.08.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/52]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.12.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201109   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0069189  (ERICSSON INC [US]) [X] 1-3,16,23 * page 4, line 24 - page 8, line 29 * * page 9, line 26 - page 12, line 2; figures 4-7 *;
 [A]GB2338150  (ORANGE PERSONAL COMM SERV LTD [GB]) [A] 1-26 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 7 * * page 7, line 15 - page 11, line 13; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO0167674  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-26 * page 3, line 2 - page 7, line 16 *
International search[A]US6138011  ;
 [YP]US6411815  ;
 [XP]US2003078064  ;
 [X]US6021326  ;
 [Y]US6304558  ;
 [A]US5711011