Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1512055

EP1512055 - HYBRID HUMAN/ELECTRIC POWERED VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.10.2010
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DEKA PRODUCTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
340 Commercial Street
Manchester, NH 03101 / US
[2009/48]
Former [2005/10]For all designated states
DEKA PRODUCTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
340 Commercial Street
Manchester, NH 03101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KAMEN, Dean, L.
15 Westwind Drive
Bedford, NH 03110 / US
02 / KERWIN, John, M.
291 Ray Street
Manchester, NH 03104 / US
 [2005/10]
Representative(s)Greene, Simon Kenneth
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/10]Greene, Simon Kenneth
Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date03736981.611.06.2003
[2005/10]
WO2003US18267
Priority number, dateUS20020387641P11.06.2002         Original published format: US 387641 P
[2005/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03103559
Date:18.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1512055
Date:09.03.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003
[2005/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1512055
Date:25.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:G05D1/08
[2005/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/10]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VON MENSCHEN/ELEKTRISCH ANGETRIEBENES HYBRIDFAHRZEUG[2005/10]
English:HYBRID HUMAN/ELECTRIC POWERED VEHICLE[2005/10]
French:VEHICULE HYBRIDE A COMMANDE HUMAINE/ELECTRIQUE[2005/10]
Entry into regional phase15.12.2004National basic fee paid 
15.12.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/10]
19.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.2009Fee for grant paid
05.10.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.08.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200604   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2006
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
IT25.11.2009
NL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
SK25.11.2009
TR25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
GR26.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
PT25.03.2010
HU26.05.2010
IE11.06.2010
LU11.06.2010
CH30.06.2010
LI30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/43]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
IT25.11.2009
NL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
SK25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
GR26.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
PT25.03.2010
HU26.05.2010
IE11.06.2010
LU11.06.2010
CH30.06.2010
LI30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2012/42]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
IT25.11.2009
NL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
SK25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
GR26.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
PT25.03.2010
HU26.05.2010
IE11.06.2010
CH30.06.2010
LI30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/20]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
IT25.11.2009
NL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
SK25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
GR26.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
PT25.03.2010
IE11.06.2010
CH30.06.2010
LI30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/19]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
IT25.11.2009
NL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
SK25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
GR26.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
PT25.03.2010
IE11.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/14]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
IT25.11.2009
NL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
SK25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
GR26.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
PT25.03.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/07]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
NL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
SK25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
GR26.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
PT25.03.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2010/48]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
NL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
SK25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
GR26.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
PT25.03.2010
Former [2010/39]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
NL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
SK25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
PT25.03.2010
Former [2010/36]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
CZ25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
NL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
PT25.03.2010
Former [2010/35]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
DK25.11.2009
EE25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
NL25.11.2009
RO25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
BG25.02.2010
ES08.03.2010
PT25.03.2010
Former [2010/32]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
NL25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
ES08.03.2010
PT25.03.2010
Former [2010/31]AT25.11.2009
BE25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
PT25.03.2010
Former [2010/30]AT25.11.2009
CY25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
PT25.03.2010
Former [2010/25]CY25.11.2009
FI25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
PT25.03.2010
Former [2010/23]FI25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
SI25.11.2009
PT25.03.2010
Former [2010/22]FI25.11.2009
SE25.11.2009
PT25.03.2010
Cited inInternational search[XAY]US3869011  (JENSEN HOWARD) [X] 1-5,8,10,11 * the whole document * [A] 9,12-15 [Y] 6,7;
 [YA]FR2620540  (SOROKINE VICTOR [FR]) [Y] 6 * the whole document * [A] 1-5,7-15;
 [YA]US4566707  (NITZBERG LEONARD R [US]) [Y] 7 * the whole document * [A] 1-6,8-15;
 [AD]US5701965  (KAMEN DEAN L [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5701965
 US6332103