Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1481292

EP1481292 - BATTERY-POWERED WRISTWATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Line, Henry
191 Ridge Drive
Carlisls, PA 17013 / US
[2004/49]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2004/49]
Representative(s)Lippich, Wolfgang , et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 6
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Lippich, Wolfgang , et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2004/49]Lippich, Wolfgang , et al
Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03737607.604.02.2003
[2004/49]
WO2003US03246
Priority number, dateUS2002006806305.02.2002         Original published format: US 68063
[2004/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03067340
Date:14.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1481292
Date:01.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003
[2004/49]
Search report(s)International search reportUS13.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:G04B1/00, G04B37/00, G04C3/00, A44C5/00
[2004/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
TitleGerman:BATTERIEBETRIEBENE ARMBANDUHR[2004/49]
English:BATTERY-POWERED WRISTWATCH[2004/49]
French:MONTRE-BRACELET A PILES[2004/49]
Entry into regional phase30.08.2004National basic fee paid 
30.08.2004Search fee paid 
30.08.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.08.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/49]
01.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/17]
10.10.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200604   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US4095412  (BURKE ROGER A);
 [X]US4407590  (OHNO HIDESHI [JP], et al);
 [X]US5181192  (PARATTE DANIEL [CH], et al);
 [Y]US5712553  (HALLBERG BRYAN SEVERT [US])