Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1512214

EP1512214 - CURRENT-COMPENSATED CHOKE AND CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING THE CURRENT-COMPENSATED CHOKE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.03.2011
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
10.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TDK Electronics AG
Rosenheimer Strasse 141e
81671 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/47]For all designated states
TDK Electronics AG
Rosenheimer Strasse 141
81671 München / DE
Former [2018/15]For all designated states
Epcos AG
Rosenheimer Strasse 141e
81671 München / DE
Former [2005/10]For all designated states
EPCOS AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BRUNEL, Roman
Narzissenstrasse 15
89173 Lonsee/Halzhausen / DE
02 / KARASEK, Manfred
An der Ammerhalde 21
89555 Steinheim / DE
 [2005/10]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2005/10]Epping Hermann & Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, Riederstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date03737935.106.06.2003
[2005/10]
WO2003DE01894
Priority number, dateDE2002102540907.06.2002         Original published format: DE 10225409
[2005/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03105328
Date:18.12.2003
Language:DE
[2003/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1512214
Date:09.03.2005
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003
[2005/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1512214
Date:20.04.2011
Language:DE
[2011/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:H02M1/12, H02M1/44
[2010/40]
Former International [2005/10]H02M1/12, H02J3/01
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/10]
TitleGerman:STROMKOMPENSIERTE DROSSEL UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG MIT DER STROMKOMPENSIERTEN DROSSEL[2005/10]
English:CURRENT-COMPENSATED CHOKE AND CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING THE CURRENT-COMPENSATED CHOKE[2005/10]
French:BOBINE A COMPENSATION DE COURANT ET CIRCUIT COMPRENANT CETTE BOBINE A COMPENSATION DE COURANT[2005/10]
Entry into regional phase19.10.2004National basic fee paid 
19.10.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.10.2004Examination requested  [2005/10]
20.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2011Fee for grant paid
07.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.08.2011  29.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
SEW-EURODRIVE GMBH & CO. KG
Abtlg. ECG Ernst-Blickle-Str. 42
D-76646 Bruchsal / DE
 02  17.01.2012   
SCHAFFNER EMV AG
Nordstrasse 11
4542 Luterbach / CH
Opponent's representative
Gervasio, Giovanni
P&TS SA
Av. J.-J. Rousseau 4
P.O. Box 2848
CH-2001 Neuchâtel / CH
 [2012/08]
Former [2011/38]
Opponent(s)01  11.08.2011   
SEW-EURODRIVE GMBH & CO. KG
Abtlg. ECG Ernst-Blickle-Str. 42
D-76646 Bruchsal / DE
27.02.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.09.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
08.12.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.12.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition06.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0278/15
08.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
20.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
25.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HU20.04.2011
IE20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
TR20.04.2011
AT06.06.2011
LU06.06.2011
BE30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
BG20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
GB06.06.2015
IT06.06.2015
FR30.06.2015
[2016/25]
Former [2016/23]CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HU20.04.2011
IE20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
TR20.04.2011
AT06.06.2011
LU06.06.2011
BE30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
BG20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
GB06.06.2015
IT06.06.2015
Former [2016/08]CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HU20.04.2011
IE20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
TR20.04.2011
AT06.06.2011
LU06.06.2011
BE30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
BG20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
IT06.06.2015
Former [2013/45]CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
HU20.04.2011
IE20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
TR20.04.2011
AT06.06.2011
LU06.06.2011
BE30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
BG20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
Former [2013/44]CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
IE20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
TR20.04.2011
AT06.06.2011
LU06.06.2011
BE30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
BG20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
Former [2013/29]CY20.04.2011
CZ20.04.2011
DK20.04.2011
EE20.04.2011
FI20.04.2011
IE20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SE20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
AT06.06.2011
LU06.06.2011
BE30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
BG20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0930695  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,9 * figure 4; claim 3 *;
 [X]JPH1094244  ;
 [X]US6288915  (STULZ CHRISTIAN ET AL) [X] 1,9 * column 4, line 3 - column 4, line 10; figures 2,3 *;
 [PX]US2002130649  (RAITH SEBASTIAN ET AL) [PX] 1,7-9 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0022] , [0025] , [0026]; figures 1,3; claim 4 *;
 [A]WO0051225  (WOBBEN ALOYS) [A] 1-9 * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 8; figure 2 *;
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10094244 A 19980410 (OKAYAMA UNIV) [X] 1,4,7,9 * abstract *
 [A]  - OGASAWARA S ET AL, "Measurement and reduction of EMI radiated by a PWM inverter-fed AC motor drive system", INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1996. THIRTY-FIRST IAS ANNUAL MEETING, IAS '96., CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 1996 IEEE SAN DIEGO, CA, USA 6-10 OCT. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19961006), ISBN 0-7803-3544-9, pages 1072 - 1079, XP010201427

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IAS.1996.560213