blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1520273 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1520273



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 342
02.09.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 2
02.09.2016 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
22.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.08.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 30
18.08.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.05.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
10.05.2016 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
04.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.01.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
25.01.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 14
20.01.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.11.2013 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
19.11.2013 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
12.08.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
07.08.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
06.08.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
08.11.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.11.2010 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
31.08.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
16.08.2010 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
05.07.2010 Document concerning representation Appeal 2
02.07.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
02.07.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
02.07.2010 Claims Appeal 5
02.07.2010 Claims Appeal 6
02.07.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
28.04.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
22.03.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
26.02.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
22.02.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
22.02.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
22.02.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
22.02.2010 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
22.02.2010 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
22.02.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 15
22.02.2010 Means of redress Search / examination 2
22.02.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
22.02.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
22.02.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
22.02.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
15.01.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
14.01.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
18.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
18.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
18.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
18.12.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
18.12.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 15
12.11.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.11.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.10.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
28.10.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
05.10.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
30.09.2009 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
03.08.2009 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.07.2009 General enquiry Search / examination 1
27.02.2009 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.02.2009 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
15.12.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
15.12.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
15.12.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
15.12.2006 Claims Search / examination 5
15.12.2006 Claims Search / examination 6
15.12.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
15.12.2006 Description Search / examination 5
15.12.2006 Description Search / examination 2
15.12.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 11
18.10.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.10.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.06.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
08.06.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.04.2006 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
10.04.2006 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
10.04.2006 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
15.03.2006 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
21.02.2006 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
21.02.2006 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
01.02.2006 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.02.2006 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.02.2006 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.02.2006 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.11.2005 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
12.10.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
13.09.2005 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
06.09.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.09.2005 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
23.02.2005 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.02.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
19.01.2005 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 28
03.03.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
15.01.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.01.2004 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 23