Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1521540

EP1521540 - HEATING VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.10.2018Revocation of patentpublished on 28.11.2018  [2018/48]
26.10.2018New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jetboil, Inc.
8 Rayton Road
Hanover, NH 03755 / US
[2005/15]
Inventor(s)01 / DOWST, Perry, W.
185 Poor Farm Road
Weare, NH 03281 / US
02 / ASPINWALL, Dwight, C.
8 Hayton Road
Hanover, NH 03755 / US
 [2005/15]
Representative(s)Somervell, Thomas Richard , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street
Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Hackett, Sean James
Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Former [2005/15]Hackett, Sean James
Marks & Clerk, Patent Attorneys, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date03739294.125.06.2003
[2005/15]
WO2003US19957
Priority number, dateUS20020391480P25.06.2002         Original published format: US 391480 P
US20020420305P22.10.2002         Original published format: US 420305 P
US20020429800P27.11.2002         Original published format: US 429800 P
[2005/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004000082
Date:31.12.2003
Language:EN
[2004/01]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1521540
Date:13.04.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003
[2005/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1521540
Date:08.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.10.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2006
ClassificationInternational:A47J27/21, A47J27/00, F24C5/10
[2005/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/15]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ERHITZUNGSGERÄT[2005/15]
English:HEATING VESSEL[2005/15]
French:RECIPIENT CHAUFFANT[2005/15]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2005National basic fee paid 
18.01.2005Search fee paid 
18.01.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2005Examination requested  [2005/15]
28.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2008Fee for grant paid
21.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.06.2009  06.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Primus AB
Hemvärnsgatan 22
17106 Solna / SE
Opponent's representative
Grosse, Felix Christopher, et al
Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14
80335 München / DE
 [2012/09]
Former [2009/31]
Opponent(s)01  19.06.2009   
Primus AB
Hemvärnsgatan 22
17106 Solna / SE
Opponent's representative
Grosse, Wolfgang, et al
Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14
80335 München / DE
01.09.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.03.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.02.2012Date of oral proceedings
28.03.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.04.2012Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
11.06.2012Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
22.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
29.04.2013Reply to a communication from the opposition division
29.08.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.07.2018Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/48]
04.10.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.11.2013Appeal received No.  T2279/13
08.01.2014Statement of grounds filed
13.07.2018Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
13.07.2018Date of oral proceedings
18.07.2018Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CY08.10.2008
CZ08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
IT08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
SK08.10.2008
TR08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
GR09.01.2009
ES19.01.2009
PT18.02.2009
HU09.04.2009
IE25.06.2009
LU25.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
[2015/21]
Former [2011/31]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CZ08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
IT08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
SK08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
GR09.01.2009
ES19.01.2009
PT18.02.2009
HU09.04.2009
IE25.06.2009
LU25.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2011/21]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CZ08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
IT08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
SK08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
GR09.01.2009
ES19.01.2009
PT18.02.2009
IE25.06.2009
LU25.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2010/48]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CZ08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
IT08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
SK08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
GR09.01.2009
ES19.01.2009
PT18.02.2009
IE25.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2010/21]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CZ08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
IT08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
SK08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
ES19.01.2009
PT18.02.2009
IE25.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2010/07]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CZ08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
IT08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
SK08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
ES19.01.2009
PT18.02.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2009/43]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CZ08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
IT08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
SK08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
ES19.01.2009
PT18.02.2009
Former [2009/39]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CZ08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
IT08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
ES19.01.2009
PT18.02.2009
Former [2009/36]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
ES19.01.2009
PT18.02.2009
Former [2009/32]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
ES19.01.2009
PT18.02.2009
Former [2009/26]AT08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
ES19.01.2009
PT18.02.2009
Former [2009/23]AT08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
ES19.01.2009
Former [2009/20]SI08.10.2008
ES19.01.2009
Former [2009/16]SI08.10.2008
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB882881  (PRESTIGE GROUP LTD) [X] 1-4,8-18 * page 1, line 19 - page 2, line 21 * * page 2, line 80 - line 105; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5-7,19-28;
 [Y]FR2493125  (FAURIE BERNARD [FR]) [Y] 5,7,25 * page 2, line 25 - page 4, line 37; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US5992407  (TSAI TIEN-SHEN [TW]) [Y] 6,19-24,26-28 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 17; figure 4 *
International search[Y]JPH11244135  (SHIN NIPPON MACHINERY CO LTD);
 [Y]JP2001149225  (SAITO TAKEO);
 [Y]JPH11206572  (FURUSAWA TOSHIICHI);
 [Y]US2014931  ;
 [Y]US3069148  (JACOB MORRIS L);
 [Y]US5373836  (MIFUNE HIDEO [JP], et al);
 [Y]US5564589  (FU HSEUH-CHIEN [US], et al)
by applicantUS221749
 US2036611
 US3978844
 US4191173
 US5408987
 US5125393
 US3709198
 US3730165