Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1521540 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1521540



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1453
25.10.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
11.10.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.10.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
04.10.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 18
04.10.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.10.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.07.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.07.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.07.2018 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 4
06.07.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.07.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
19.06.2018 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
19.06.2018 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
15.06.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.06.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
12.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
12.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
12.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
12.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
12.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
12.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
12.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
12.06.2018 Claims Appeal 2
12.06.2018 Claims Appeal 2
12.06.2018 Claims Appeal 2
12.06.2018 Claims Appeal 2
12.06.2018 Claims Appeal 2
12.06.2018 Claims Appeal 2
12.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
12.06.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
17.05.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 9
17.05.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 9
28.12.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
22.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.12.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
20.12.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.12.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.12.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
26.01.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
09.11.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.11.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
16.03.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
13.01.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
07.01.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 6
30.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.05.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 13
16.01.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
08.01.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
08.01.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
08.01.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.01.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
08.01.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 145
08.01.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 45
08.01.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 144
08.01.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 27
18.11.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
18.11.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
08.11.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
05.11.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
05.11.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
04.11.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
04.11.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
04.11.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
18.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.08.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.08.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.08.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
29.08.2013 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 29
29.08.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 20
29.08.2013 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.08.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.05.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Opposition 1
07.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2013 Amended description with annotations Opposition 3
02.05.2013 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2013 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
22.02.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
22.02.2013 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
22.02.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.06.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2012 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 5
20.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.04.2012 Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
28.03.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.03.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
28.03.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.03.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 7
06.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.2012 Amended description with annotations Opposition 8
27.02.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.02.2012 Amended description with annotations Opposition 8
24.02.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.12.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.11.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.11.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.11.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.11.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.11.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.11.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.10.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.10.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.10.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.10.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
14.10.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
14.10.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
14.10.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
16.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.04.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.04.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.04.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
27.04.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
27.04.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
22.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
11.03.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
12.01.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.01.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
01.09.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
01.09.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.06.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
19.06.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
19.06.2009 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 35
19.06.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
19.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.03.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.09.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.08.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.08.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
25.08.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
21.08.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.08.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
21.08.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
21.08.2008 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
13.05.2008 Request for issuance of patent certificate with patent specification Search / examination 1
28.04.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
28.04.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
28.04.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.04.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 45
07.03.2008 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.01.2008 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.12.2006 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
11.12.2006 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
11.12.2006 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
10.11.2006 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
24.10.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.10.2006 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
18.09.2006 General enquiry Search / examination 1
02.03.2005 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.02.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
14.01.2005 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
14.01.2005 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
14.01.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.01.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.11.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.10.2004 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
04.10.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
04.10.2004 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
11.06.2004 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
25.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 54
25.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 60
25.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 52
19.02.2004 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 50
31.12.2003 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 50