Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1490411 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1490411



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 856
03.08.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
01.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.08.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
31.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.07.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
20.07.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
17.07.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.07.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
06.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
06.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
06.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
06.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
06.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.07.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 3
06.03.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.03.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.03.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.02.2018 Refund of fees Appeal 1
15.02.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
05.02.2018 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
05.02.2018 Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 8
05.02.2018 Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 8
27.10.2017 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal during review procedure Appeal 6
27.10.2017 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
28.09.2017 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
25.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
25.09.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
02.08.2017 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
27.07.2017 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
25.07.2017 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
24.07.2017 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
24.07.2017 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
11.07.2017 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
05.07.2017 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
22.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.06.2017 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 3
19.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
19.05.2017 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 2
11.05.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
24.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.04.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 8
12.04.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.04.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.07.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
24.08.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
22.01.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
12.11.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
23.08.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.08.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
16.08.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.08.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
16.08.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
16.08.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
16.08.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
10.08.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
07.08.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.08.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
11.06.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
05.06.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
04.06.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.06.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
18.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.04.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
04.04.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
04.04.2012 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
04.04.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
04.04.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.04.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
04.04.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.03.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2012 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
12.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.01.2012 Claims Opposition 3
09.01.2012 Claims Opposition 3
09.01.2012 Claims Opposition 3
09.01.2012 Claims Opposition 3
09.01.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
05.01.2012 Claims Opposition 12
05.01.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.11.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.11.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.10.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.10.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.10.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
25.10.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.10.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.10.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2011 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
31.01.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
11.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
29.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.03.2010 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.03.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
29.03.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.03.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
03.03.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
27.11.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
27.11.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.10.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.10.2009 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 4
20.10.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
20.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
20.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
20.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
20.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
20.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
20.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
20.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
20.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
20.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
20.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
20.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
19.10.2009 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 4
19.10.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
19.10.2009 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
30.12.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.11.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.11.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
26.11.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
12.08.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
12.08.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
12.08.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.08.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
02.07.2008 Description Search / examination 3
02.07.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.06.2008 Description Search / examination 3
27.06.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.06.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
23.06.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.05.2008 Claims Search / examination 5
29.05.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.05.2008 Claims Search / examination 5
26.05.2008 Claims Search / examination 5
26.05.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.05.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.04.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.04.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.12.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
13.12.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.12.2004 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
19.11.2004 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
17.11.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.11.2004 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
22.10.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
18.10.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.10.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.10.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.10.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.08.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
12.08.2004 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
12.08.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
11.08.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
25.06.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
19.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38
12.03.2004 Refund of fees PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.02.2004 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
16.01.2004 International preliminary examination report - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.01.2004 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.01.2004 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.10.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.10.2003 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.10.2003 Written opinion - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
29.08.2003 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.08.2003 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
21.08.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.08.2003 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 37
10.03.2003 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
10.03.2003 Claims International Searching Authority 5
10.03.2003 Description International Searching Authority 31