Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1490411


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.07.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
27.02.2018 New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected
02.02.2018 Petition for review: decision published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
31.01.2018 Deletion: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
12.07.2017 New entry: Number of petition for review
12.07.2017 New entry: Petitioner in petition for review
05.07.2017 New entry: Date of filing of petition for review
12.05.2017 Revocation of patent published on  14.06.2017  [2017/24]
12.05.2017 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
08.04.2017 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
18.12.2015 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
18.12.2015 Change: Date of oral proceedings
18.12.2015 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.04.2015 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
03.08.2012 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
05.06.2012 Change: Appeal number
05.06.2012 New entry: Appeal number
05.06.2012 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
03.04.2012 New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected
29.03.2012 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.10.2011 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
01.07.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.08.2011  [2011/31]
22.04.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.05.2011  [2011/21]
04.03.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.04.2011  [2011/14]
04.03.2011 Change - representative published on  06.04.2011  [2011/14]
29.10.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.12.2010  [2010/48]
08.06.2010 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.03.2010 Change - representative published on  28.04.2010  [2010/17]
25.03.2010 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
22.01.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.02.2010  [2010/08]
15.01.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.02.2010  [2010/07]
20.11.2009 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
13.11.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.12.2009  [2009/51]
06.11.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.12.2009  [2009/50]
30.10.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.12.2009  [2009/49]
23.10.2009 Opposition filed published on  25.11.2009  [2009/48]
16.10.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.11.2009  [2009/47]
09.10.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.11.2009  [2009/46]
18.09.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.10.2009  [2009/43]
28.08.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.09.2009  [2009/40]
21.08.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.09.2009  [2009/39]
31.07.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.09.2009  [2009/36]
17.07.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2009  [2009/34]
19.12.2008 (Expected) grant published on  21.01.2009  [2009/04]
03.12.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
03.12.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.08.2008 Change - inventor published on  10.09.2008  [2008/37]
06.08.2008 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.07.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
19.06.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.05.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.04.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.02.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.12.2007 First examination report
06.12.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.02.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.02.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.04.2005 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
13.04.2005 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
23.02.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.12.2004 Change - inventor published on  26.01.2005  [2005/04]
12.11.2004 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.12.2004  [2004/53]
12.11.2004 Request for examination filed published on  29.12.2004  [2004/53]
03.11.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
02.11.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
13.10.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
20.08.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
28.02.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
14.11.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
23.08.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
22.08.2003 PCT data prior to European publication