Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1490411

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 21.01.2009
 BELapse: 21.01.2009
 BGLapse: 21.04.2009
 CHLapse: 28.02.2009
CYLapse: 21.01.2009
 CZLapse: 21.01.2009
 DE 
 DKLapse: 21.01.2009
 EELapse: 21.01.2009
 ESLapse: 02.05.2009
 FILapse: 21.01.2009
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 22.04.2009
 HULapse: 22.07.2009
 IELapse: 11.02.2009
 ITLapse: 21.01.2009
LILapse: 28.02.2009
 LULapse: 11.02.2009
 MCLapse: 28.02.2009
 NL 
 PTLapse: 22.06.2009
 SELapse: 21.04.2009
 SILapse: 21.01.2009
 SKLapse: 21.01.2009
 TRLapse: 21.01.2009
Examination procedure26.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase11.08.2004National basic fee paid 
11.08.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2004Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted21.01.2009
Opposition procedure22.04.2017Legal effect of revocation of patent published on 14.06.2017 
Appeal following opposition04.06.2012APPEAL FILED
02.08.2012APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:29.12.2004 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20040811
 
Event date:29.12.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:29.12.2004 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK RO
 
Event date:26.01.2005 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:JOANICOT, MATHIEU
 
Event date:26.01.2005 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:KIPLINGER, JON, D.
 
Event date:26.01.2005 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:MORVAN, MIKEL
 
Event date:26.01.2005 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:ADAM, HERVE
 
Event date:09.01.2008 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT
Effective DATE:20071213
 
Event date:10.09.2008 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:JOANICOT, MATHIEU
 
Event date:10.09.2008 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:KIPLINGER, JON, D.
 
Event date:10.09.2008 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:MORVAN, MIKEL
 
Event date:10.09.2008 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:ADAM, HERVE
 
Event date:21.01.2009 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:21.01.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:30.01.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:18.02.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:12.03.2009 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:60325947
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20090312
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:31.07.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090502
 
Event date:31.07.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090121
 
Event date:31.07.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090121
 
Event date:31.08.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090121
 
Event date:31.08.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090622
 
Event date:31.08.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090421
 
Event date:30.09.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090228
 
Event date:30.09.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090121
 
Event date:30.09.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:30.10.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090228
 
Event date:30.10.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090121
 
Event date:30.10.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090121
 
Event date:30.10.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090121
 
Event date:30.10.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090228
 
Event date:25.11.2009 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:BASF SE
Effective DATE:20091019
 
Event date:25.11.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:30.11.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090121
 
Event date:29.01.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090421
 
Event date:29.01.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090211
 
Event date:01.02.2010 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:BASF SE
 
Event date:29.10.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090422
 
Event date:31.03.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090121
 
Event date:29.04.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090211
 
Event date:30.06.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:HU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090722
 
Event date:31.08.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:TR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090121
 
Event date:30.09.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20090121
 
Event date:08.01.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:12.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.03.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20170110
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:22.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R103 60325947 DE
Code Expl.:-PATENT REVOKED BY EPO
 
Event date:22.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R064 60325947 DE
Code Expl.:-EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20170112
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20170207
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20170208
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:14.06.2017 
Event description:PATENT REVOKED
Effective DATE:20170422
 
Event date:14.06.2017 
Event description:GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE
Effective DATE:20170422
 
Event date:07.03.2018 
Event description:PETITION FOR REVIEW BY THE ENLARGED BOARD OF APPEAL GRANTED
Free Format Text:PETITION FOR REVIEW ALLOWED AND RE-OPENING OF THE APPEAL PROCEDURE WITH TOTAL REFUND OF THE FEE FOR THE PETITION FOR REVIEW
Effective DATE:20180129