Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1481566

EP1481566 - METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE FOR ADDING A USER TO A GROUP CALL IN A GROUP COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/49]A COMMUNICATION DEVICE FOR JOINING A USER TO A GROUP CALL IN A GROUP COMMUNICATION NETWORK
[2011/07]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2012
Database last updated on 25.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM INCORPORATED
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/49]For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CROCKETT, Douglas M.
4576 44th Street
San Diego, CA 92115 / US
02 / ROSEN, Eric C.
611 Calle Paula
Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US
03 / MAGGENTI, Mark
2480 Cordero Road
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
 [2004/49]
Representative(s)Walsh, Michael Joseph , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5, Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2004/49]Walsh, Michael Joseph , et al
TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date03739795.712.02.2003
[2004/49]
WO2003US04386
Priority number, dateUS2002007684814.02.2002         Original published format: US 76848
[2004/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03069944
Date:21.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1481566
Date:01.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003
[2004/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1481566
Date:31.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/08
[2011/35]
Former International [2004/49]H04Q7/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/49]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, COMPUTERPROGRAMM-PRODUKT UND KOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN EINES BENUTZERS MIT EINEM GRUPPENGESPRÄCH IN EINEM GRUPPENKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ[2011/07]
English:METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE FOR ADDING A USER TO A GROUP CALL IN A GROUP COMMUNICATION NETWORK[2011/07]
French:PROCEDE, PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION PERMETTANT DE RALLIER UN UTILISATEUR A UN APPEL DE GROUPE DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION[2011/07]
Former [2004/49]KOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN EINES BENUTZERS MIT EINEM GRUPPENGESPRÄCH IN EINEM GRUPPENKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ
Former [2004/49]A COMMUNICATION DEVICE FOR JOINING A USER TO A GROUP CALL IN A GROUP COMMUNICATION NETWORK
Former [2004/49]DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION PERMETTANT DE RALLIER UN UTILISATEUR A UN APPEL DE GROUPE DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION
Entry into regional phase27.08.2004National basic fee paid 
27.08.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/49]
22.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2011Fee for grant paid
21.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.01.2010
Opposition(s)01.06.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
05.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
09.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
08.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
08.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.02.2003
AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
TR31.08.2011
BG30.11.2011
GR01.12.2011
ES11.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
IE12.02.2012
LU12.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
FR29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
TR31.08.2011
BG30.11.2011
GR01.12.2011
ES11.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
IE12.02.2012
LU12.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
FR29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2014/21]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
TR31.08.2011
BG30.11.2011
GR01.12.2011
ES11.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
IE12.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
FR29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/29]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
BG30.11.2011
GR01.12.2011
ES11.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
IE12.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
FR29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/22]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
ES11.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
IE12.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
FR29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/08]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
IE12.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
FR29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/07]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
CH29.02.2012
FR29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2012/49]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2012/42]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2012/33]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
Former [2012/23]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
Former [2012/21]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
Former [2012/17]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
Former [2012/12]AT31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
Former [2012/11]AT31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
Former [2012/10]FI31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
Former [2012/09]FI31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
Former [2012/08]NL31.08.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2281676  (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,11,12,21,22,31,32 * page 5, line 10 - line 22; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO0167674  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1,11,21,31 * page 29, line 5 - page 33, line 5 *;
 [A]US2240094  (FOREMAN WILLIAM H) [A] 1,11,21,31 * column 3, line 41 - line 68 *