Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1519866

EP1519866 - BREATHING DEVICE FOR A BRAKE CYLINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.12.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.01.2010  [2010/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WABCO GmbH
Am Lindener Hafen 21
30453 Hannover / DE
[2006/52]
Former [2005/14]For all designated states
WABCO GmbH & CO. OHG
Am Lindener Hafen 21
30453 Hannover / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BRANDT, Oliver
Am Lehmanger 1
31120 Braunschweig / DE
02 / GLOGOWSCHEK, Roland
Skagenhof 7
30457 Hannover / DE
03 / RICHTER, Andreas
Auf dem Grossen Kampe 34
30900 Wedemark / DE
04 / UNGER, Herbert
Eichendorffstrasse 10
31832 Springe / DE
05 / WEBER, Thorsten
Hohner Strasse 59
31515 Wunstorf / DE
06 / RISCHER, Ulrich
Am Wischkamp 5
31832 Springe / DE
 [2005/14]
Representative(s)Günther, Constantin , et al
WABCO GmbH
Postfach 91 12 62
30432 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Günther, Constantin , et al
WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62
30432 Hannover / DE
Former [2006/52]Günther, Constantin , et al
WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62
30432 Hannover / DE
Former [2005/14]Günther, Constantin
WABCO GmbH & Co. OHG, Am Lindener Hafen 21
30453 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date03740371.427.06.2003
[2005/14]
WO2003EP06867
Priority number, dateDE200212893428.06.2002         Original published format: DE 10228934
[2005/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004002799
Date:08.01.2004
Language:DE
[2004/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1519866
Date:06.04.2005
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004
[2005/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1519866
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:B60T17/08
[2005/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   SE [2005/42]
Former [2005/14]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEATMUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN BREMSZYLINDER[2005/14]
English:BREATHING DEVICE FOR A BRAKE CYLINDER[2005/14]
French:DISPOSITIF DE VENTILATION D'UN CYLINDRE DE FREINAGE[2005/14]
Entry into regional phase28.01.2005National basic fee paid 
28.01.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
28.01.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.01.2005Examination requested  [2005/14]
04.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2008Fee for grant paid
25.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]GB1237641  (MGM BRAKES [US]) [X] 3 * page 2, line 54 - page 4, line 5 *;
 [X]US6148711  (STOJIC STEVEN M [US]) [X] 1 * column 6, line 23 - column 9, line 3 *;
 [X]DE2942387  (KNORR BREMSE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 7, line 27 - page 9, line 10 *;
 [A]FR2545175  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 6 - page 6, line 10 *;
 [A]EP0020862  (KNORR BREMSE GMBH [DE]) [A] 2,3 * column 4, line 55 - column 6, line 25 *;
 [A]US3710692  (VALENTINE H) [A] 2,3 * column 1, line 62 - column 3, line 45 *;
 [A]EP0279930  (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 23 * * column 10, line 8 - line 50 *