Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1366541

EP1366541 - ANTENNA FOR A RECEIVER AND/OR TRANSMITTER, ESPECIALLY A ROOF ANTENNA FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.10.2006
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2019New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
04.12.2019Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kathrein-Werke KG
Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3
83022 Rosenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/45]For all designated states
Kathrein Werke KG
Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3
83022 Rosenheim / DE
Former [2003/49]For all designated states
Kathrein-Werke KG
Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3
83022 Rosenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / PRASSMAYER, Peter, Karl
Tulpenweg 29
83109 Grosskarolinenfeld / DE
02 / MAGG, Christian
Kaulbachstrasse 8
84518 Garching/Alz / DE
 [2003/49]
Representative(s)Flach Bauer Stahl Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Adlzreiterstraße 11
83022 Rosenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul
Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11
83022 Rosenheim / DE
Former [2003/49]Flach, Dieter Dipl.-Phys.
Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11
83022 Rosenheim / DE
Application number, filing date03742563.420.02.2003
[2003/49]
WO2003EP01751
Priority number, dateDE2002100770322.02.2002         Original published format: DE 10207703
[2003/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03071630
Date:28.08.2003
Language:DE
[2003/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1366541
Date:03.12.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2003
[2003/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1366541
Date:08.11.2006
Language:DE
[2006/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01Q5/00, H01Q5/02, H01Q1/32, H01Q21/30
[2003/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANTENNE FÜR EINE EMPFANGS-UND/ODER SENDEEINRICHTUNG INSBESONDERE ALS DACHANTENNEFÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE[2003/49]
English:ANTENNA FOR A RECEIVER AND/OR TRANSMITTER, ESPECIALLY A ROOF ANTENNA FOR MOTOR VEHICLES[2003/49]
French:ANTENNE POUR DISPOSITIF RECEPTEUR ET/OU EMETTEUR, EN PARTICULIER ANTENNE DE TOIT POUR VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES[2003/49]
Entry into regional phase25.09.2003National basic fee paid 
25.09.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.1950Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/49]
02.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2006Fee for grant paid
13.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.06.2007  22.08.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Wilhelm Sihn jr. GmbH & Co. KG Wilhelm-Sihn-Strasse 5-7
D-75223 Niefern-Öschelbronn / DE
Opponent's representative
Twelmeier Mommer & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Westliche 56-68
75172 Pforzheim / DE
 [2009/30]
Former [2007/32]
Opponent(s)01  22.06.2007   
Wilhelm Sihn jr. GmbH & Co. KG Wilhelm-Sihn-Strasse 5-7
D-75223 Niefern-Öschelbronn / DE
Opponent's representative
Twelmeier Mommer & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Westliche 56-68
75175 Pforzheim / DE
24.09.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.01.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.02.2008Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
17.03.2008Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
01.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
31.10.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
31.10.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition18.12.2014Appeal received No.  T0009/15
26.02.2015Statement of grounds filed
28.11.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
EE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
TR08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
AT20.02.2007
LU20.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
HU09.05.2007
GB20.02.2016
IT20.02.2016
ES21.02.2016
SE21.02.2016
FR29.02.2016
[2017/38]
Former [2017/10]CY08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
EE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
TR08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
AT20.02.2007
LU20.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
HU09.05.2007
GB20.02.2016
IT20.02.2016
SE21.02.2016
FR29.02.2016
Former [2017/08]CY08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
EE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
TR08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
AT20.02.2007
LU20.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
HU09.05.2007
GB20.02.2016
IT20.02.2016
SE21.02.2016
Former [2017/04]CY08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
EE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
TR08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
AT20.02.2007
LU20.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
HU09.05.2007
IT20.02.2016
SE21.02.2016
Former [2016/52]CY08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
EE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
TR08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
AT20.02.2007
LU20.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
HU09.05.2007
SE21.02.2016
Former [2009/43]CY08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
EE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
TR08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
AT20.02.2007
LU20.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
HU09.05.2007
Former [2009/39]CY08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
EE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
AT20.02.2007
LU20.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2009/10]CZ08.11.2006
EE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
AT20.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2008/29]CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
AT20.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2008/22]CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2008/04]CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2007/49]CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2007/47]CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2007/42]CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2007/40]CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2007/29]FI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
Former [2007/25]FI08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
Cited inInternational search[DY]WO0171847  (NIPPON ANTENA KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [DY] 1 * abstract *;
 EP1187253  [ ] (NIPPON ANTENNA KABUSHIKI KAISHA);
 [Y]EP0954054  (YOKOWO SEISAKUSHO KK) [Y] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5999132  (JOHNSTON RONALD HARVEY ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [PA]EP1263079  (NOKIA CORP) [PA] 1 * abstract *;
 [PA]WO02069444  (SHIMIZU HIROSHI ;NIPPON ANTENA KABUSHIKI KAISHA (JP)) [PA] 1;
 EP1291967  [ ]