blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1481352 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1481352



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 579
14.02.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.02.2018 F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition Appeal 1
31.01.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 2
26.01.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
24.01.2018 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
20.01.2017 Refund of fees Appeal 1
16.01.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
22.12.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.12.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 6
26.08.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
11.06.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
03.06.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
07.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
07.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
07.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
07.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
07.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
07.04.2015 Claims Appeal 2
07.04.2015 Claims Appeal 2
07.04.2015 Claims Appeal 2
07.04.2015 Claims Appeal 2
07.04.2015 Claims Appeal 3
07.04.2015 Claims Appeal 3
07.04.2015 Claims Appeal 2
07.04.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
24.02.2015 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
06.02.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.02.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
08.12.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.12.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
26.11.2014 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
26.11.2014 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
26.11.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
26.11.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 9
26.11.2014 Means of redress Search / examination 2
26.11.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.11.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
04.11.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
04.11.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
04.11.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
04.11.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
04.11.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.11.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
04.11.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
31.10.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
30.10.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.10.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
06.10.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
06.10.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 2
26.05.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.05.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
16.05.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
16.05.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
16.05.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
16.05.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.09.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
13.09.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 4
19.01.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
19.01.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
19.01.2011 Description Search / examination 5
19.01.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
08.12.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.11.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.07.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
19.07.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.05.2010 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
15.04.2010 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
29.03.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.03.2010 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
11.04.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.11.2004 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
20.10.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.10.2004 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
28.09.2004 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
22.09.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
17.09.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.09.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.09.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.09.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.09.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.09.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.08.2004 Annex Search / examination 1
31.08.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.07.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
19.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 106
19.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 84
19.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 109
19.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 50
11.12.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
11.12.2003 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
28.08.2003 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 39