blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1481352


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.02.2018 Refusal of application published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
31.01.2018 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
14.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.01.2017 Change - applicant published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
12.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.06.2015 Change: Appeal number
09.04.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
14.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.02.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
10.02.2015 New entry: Appeal number
26.11.2014 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.11.2014 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
16.05.2014 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
14.02.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.09.2013 Change - applicant published on  23.10.2013  [2013/43]
20.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.08.2012 Change - divisional application(s) published on  12.09.2012  [2012/37]
21.02.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.02.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.02.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.12.2010 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.07.2010 First examination report
15.07.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.03.2010 Supplementary search report published on  28.04.2010  [2010/17]
20.02.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.03.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.03.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.03.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.04.2005 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
19.04.2005 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
08.03.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.11.2004 Change - inventor published on  05.01.2005  [2005/01]
15.10.2004 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.12.2004  [2004/49]
15.10.2004 Request for examination filed published on  01.12.2004  [2004/49]
29.09.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
22.09.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
10.09.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
03.09.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
25.02.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
21.02.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
12.12.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
02.09.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
30.08.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
29.08.2003 PCT data prior to European publication