blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1481352

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HU 
IE 
IT 
LI 
LU 
MC 
NL 
PT 
SE 
SI 
SK 
TR 
Examination procedure24.01.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/10]
Entry into regional phase31.08.2004National basic fee paid 
31.08.2004Search fee paid 
31.08.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.2004Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
Appeal following examination06.02.2015APPEAL FILED
07.04.2015APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
24.01.2018APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:01.12.2004 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20040831
 
Event date:01.12.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:01.12.2004 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK RO
 
Event date:05.01.2005 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:DORAN, MICHAEL
 
Event date:05.01.2005 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:MARTIN, DOUGLAS, A.
 
Event date:05.01.2005 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:DEAN, SCOTT, A.
 
Event date:05.01.2005 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:JACOBSON, JESSACA
 
Event date:05.01.2005 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:HANSON, KIM, P.
 
Event date:05.01.2005 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:SMITH, KERRY
 
Event date:28.04.2010 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20100329
 
Event date:18.08.2010 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20100719
 
Event date:23.10.2013 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:OUTERWALL INC.
 
Event date:15.02.2017 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:COINSTAR, LLC
 
Event date:24.01.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R003
Code Expl.:-REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL
 
Event date:07.03.2018 
Event description:APPLICATION REFUSED
Effective DATE:20180124