Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1481352

EP1481352 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR EXCHANGING AND/OR TRANSFERRING VARIOUS FORMS OF VALUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 07.03.2018  [2018/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coinstar, LLC
c/o Corporation Service Company
2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
[2017/07]
Former [2013/43]For all designated states
Outerwall Inc.
1800 114th Avenue S.E.
Bellevue, WA 98004 / US
Former [2004/49]For all designated states
Coinstar, Inc.
1800 114th Avenue S.E.
Bellevue, WA 98004 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DORAN, Michael
1925-237th Place S.E.
Bothell, WA 98021 / US
02 / MARTIN, Douglas, A.
19525 N.E. 159th Street
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
03 / DEAN, Scott, A.
5196-235 Place S.E.
Issaquah WA 98029 / US
04 / JACOBSON, Jessaca
12569 S.E. 71th Street
Newcastle, WA 98056 / US
05 / HANSON, Kim, P.
20808 N.E. 141st Street
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
06 / SMITH, Kerry
14931 S.E. 60th Street
Bellevue, WA 98006 / US
 [2005/01]
Former [2004/49]01 / DORAN, Michael
1925-237th Place S.E.
Bothell, WA 98021 / US
02 / MARTIN, Douglas, A.
19525 N.E. 159th Street
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
03 / DEAN, Scott, A.
15979 N.E. 95th Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
04 / JACOBSON, Jessaca
12569 S.E. 71th Street
Newcastle, WA 98056 / US
05 / HANSON, Kim, P.
20808 N.E. 141st Street
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
06 / SMITH, Kerry
14931 S.E. 60th Street
Bellevue, WA 98006 / US
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/49]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03742774.714.02.2003
[2004/49]
WO2003US04603
Priority number, dateUS20020357331P15.02.2002         Original published format: US 357331 P
US20020357555P15.02.2002         Original published format: US 357555 P
US20020419735P18.10.2002         Original published format: US 419735 P
US20020424377P06.11.2002         Original published format: US 424377 P
[2004/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03071387
Date:28.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/35]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1481352
Date:01.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2003
[2004/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.12.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2004/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUM AUSTAUSCH UND/ODER TRANSFER VERSCHIEDENER ARTEN VON WERTEN[2004/49]
English:METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR EXCHANGING AND/OR TRANSFERRING VARIOUS FORMS OF VALUE[2004/49]
French:PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES PERMETTANT D'ECHANGER ET/OU DE TRANSFERER DIVERSES FORMES DE VALEUR[2004/49]
Entry into regional phase31.08.2004National basic fee paid 
31.08.2004Search fee paid 
31.08.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/49]
19.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
26.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/10]
26.11.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
24.01.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/10]
Appeal following examination06.02.2015Appeal received No.  T1144/15
07.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
24.01.2018Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn
Divisional application(s)EP12005537.1  / EP2521106
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.07.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9928830  (KORMAN BRUCE R [US]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5440108  (TRAN DICH C [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6152365  (KOLLS BROCK [US]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5799767  (MOLBAK JENS H [US]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6081791  (CLARK THERESA A [US]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0159722  (TOKYO MECHATRONICS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5637845  (KOLLS BROCK [US]);
 [A]US5699328  (ISHIZAKI MASAYUKI [JP], et al);
 [A]US6116402  (BEACH KIRK [US], et al)
by applicantWO9928830
 US5440108
 US6152365
 US5799767
 US6081791