Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1481009

EP1481009 - PEPTIDES FOR USE IN ANTITUMOR IMMUNOTHERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.08.2008
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75013 Paris / FR
For all designated states
UNIVERSITE DE NANTES
1, quai de Tourville
44000 Nantes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/49]For all designated states
INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75013 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Universite de Nantes
1, quai de Tourville
44000 Nantes / FR
Inventor(s)01 / LINARD, Boris
3, rue de Libourne
F-44800 SAINT-HERBLAIN / FR
02 / JOTEREAU, Francine
6, place du 116ème Régiment d'Infanterie
F-44300 NANTES / FR
03 / BENLALAM, Houssem
1, rue Rameau
F-44000 NANTES / FR
04 / DIEZ, Elizabeth
13, Ramée la Bourchinière
F-44690 SAINT-FIACRE-SUR-MAINE / FR
05 / GUILLOUX, Yannick
19, rue du Loquidy
F-44300 NANTES / FR
06 / LABARRIERE, Nathalie
10, rue Léon Bérard
F-44200 NANTES / FR
07 / GERVOIS, Nadine
17, rue Gilbert Bauduz
F-44300 NANTES / FR
08 / DERRE, Laurent
2, rue du Clos Torreau
F-44200 NANTES / FR
 [2004/49]
Representative(s)Vialle-Presles, Marie José , et al
Cabinet ORES
36,rue de St Pétersbourg
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/49]Vialle-Presles, Marie José , et al
Cabinet ORES, 36,rue de St Pétersbourg
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date03743400.804.03.2003
[2004/49]
WO2003FR00698
Priority number, dateFR2002000270304.03.2002         Original published format: FR 0202703
[2004/49]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03074565
Date:12.09.2003
Language:FR
[2003/37]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1481009
Date:01.12.2004
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003
[2004/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/47, A61K38/17, C12N15/12, C12N5/08, C12P37/04, C07K19/00, C12N15/62
[2004/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PEPTIDE ZUR VERWENDUNG IM ANTI-TUMOR IMMUNOTHERAPIE[2004/49]
English:PEPTIDES FOR USE IN ANTITUMOR IMMUNOTHERAPY[2004/49]
French:PEPTIDES UTILISABLES EN IMMUNOTHERAPIE ANTITUMORALE.[2004/49]
Entry into regional phase27.09.2004National basic fee paid 
27.09.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.10.2004Examination requested  [2004/49]
09.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.02.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/36]
01.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200806   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0190197  (UNIV AUSTRALIAN [AU], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9 * page 15, line 21 - line 27; figure 27; example 3; claims 1,3-20,24-48,55-59; table A *;
 [X]WO0116320  (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US]) [X] 1,2,7-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0021551  (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * Le document entier; voire particulierement pages 6-9 *;
 [X]WO0153833  (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * Le document entier; voire particulierement page 26 et Table 1 *;
 [X]  - ROMERO P ET AL, "Therapeutic cancer vaccines based on molecularly defined human tumor antigens", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (20021219), vol. 20, ISSN 0264-410X, pages A2 - A7, XP004397465 [X] 1,2,8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(02)00380-8
 [X]  - MENDEZ R ET AL, "Analysis of HLA class I expression in different metastases from two melanoma patients undergoing peptide immunotherapy.", TISSUE ANTIGENS. DENMARK JUN 2001, (200106), vol. 57, no. 6, ISSN 0001-2815, pages 508 - 519, XP002265728 [X] 1,2,8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1399-0039.2001.057006508.x
 [A]  - VALMORI D ET AL, "DIVERSITY OF THE FINE SPECIFICITY DISPLAYED BY HLA-A*0201-RESTRICTED CTL SPECIFIC FOR THE IMMUNODOMINANT MELAN-A/MART-1 ANTIGENIC PEPTIDE", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE, US, (1998), vol. 161, no. 12, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 6956 - 6962, XP000886281 [A] * the whole document *
 [AD]  - BENLALAM H ET AL, "Comprehensive analysis of the frequency of recognition of melanoma-associated antigen (MAA) by CD8 melanoma infiltrating lymphocytes (TIL): implications for immunotherapy.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY. GERMANY JUL 2001, (200107), vol. 31, no. 7, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 2007 - 2015, XP002265727 [AD] * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-4141(200107)31:7<2007::AID-IMMU2007>3.3.CO;2-J