EP1483796 - ELECTRONIC DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAAK, Rogier, J. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BRON, Marco, J., R. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
MCLACHLAN, Scott, D. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | van Wermeskerken, Stephanie Christine Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | van Wermeskerken, Stephanie Christine Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03743463.6 | 25.02.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003IB00724 | Priority number, date | EP20020075861 | 06.03.2002 Original published format: EP 02075861 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03075369 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1483796 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/20, H01L27/00, G02B5/30 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
G02B5/22 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/26 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/3033 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/86 (US);
H10K59/38 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/875 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE DISPLAY-EINRICHTUNG | [2004/50] | English: | ELECTRONIC DISPLAY DEVICE | [2004/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ELECTRONIQUE | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 31.08.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9941788 (SARNOFF CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 6, lines 3-15 * * page 13, lines 1-25 *; | [DA]US6053795 (WHITNEY LELAND R [US], et al) [DA] 1,4 * abstract ** column 9, lines 16-34 *; | [A]US6211613 (MAY PAUL [GB]) [A] 1-3 * claims 1,19,20 *; | [A]US2001036013 (ALLEN RICHARD C [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 6, paragraph 68 - page 7, paragraph 77; figures 5A,5B * |