Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1487256

EP1487256 - ENHANCED POLLENIZER AND METHOD FOR INCREASING SEEDLESS WATERMELON YIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2016
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
[2004/52]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Xingping
22 Hiller Court
Woodland, CA 95776 / US
02 / WILLIAMS, Tom, Vare
2329 Pinewood Cirle
Naples, FL 34105 / US
 [2004/52]
Representative(s)SYNGENTA IP
WRO B8-Z1-30
Rosentalstrasse 67
4058 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2016/08]Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2006/19]Bastian, Werner Maria , et al
Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2004/52]Southern, David William , et al
Syngenta Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Jealott's Hill International Research Station, PO Box No 3538
Bracknell, RG42 6YA / GB
Application number, filing date03744126.825.02.2003
[2004/52]
WO2003US05720
Priority number, dateUS2002009115405.03.2002         Original published format: US 91154
US2003034950922.01.2003         Original published format: US 349509
[2004/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03075641
Date:18.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1487256
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003
[2004/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1487256
Date:24.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.07.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:A01H5/00, A01H1/00
[2004/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/08]
Former [2004/52]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTER POLLENSPENDER UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERTRAGSSTEIGERUNG BEI KERNLOSEN WASSERMELONEN[2016/06]
English:ENHANCED POLLENIZER AND METHOD FOR INCREASING SEEDLESS WATERMELON YIELD[2004/52]
French:POLLINISATEUR AMELIORE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'ACCROITRE LA PRODUCTION DE PASTEQUES SANS PEPINS[2004/52]
Former [2004/52]VERBESSERTER POLLENSTÄNDER UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERTRAGSSTEIGERUNG BEI KERNLOSEN WASSERMELONEN
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase05.10.2004National basic fee paid 
05.10.2004Search fee paid 
31.01.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.09.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.01.2005Examination requested  [2005/13]
02.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2006Date of oral proceedings
13.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
13.06.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
24.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.01.2016Fee for grant paid
06.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Appeal following examination14.07.2006Appeal received No.  T1729/06
23.10.2006Statement of grounds filed
17.09.2014Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Divisional application(s)EP10177416.4  / EP2255614
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.08.2005
Opposition(s)25.11.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
07.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
07.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.02.2016
BE24.02.2016
CY24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
MC24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
IE25.02.2016
LU25.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
[2018/32]
Former [2018/28]AT24.02.2016
BE24.02.2016
CY24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
MC24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
IE25.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2017/13]AT24.02.2016
BE24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
IE25.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2017/07]AT24.02.2016
BE24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
IE25.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2017/03]AT24.02.2016
BE24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/50]AT24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/49]AT24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/46]AT24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/39]AT24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/38]AT24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/36]AT24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/35]FI24.02.2016
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO0070933  (SUNSEEDS, INC; ELMSTROM, GARY, W) [X] 26,27 * page 3, line 19 - line 20 * * page 7, line 1 - line 16 * * page 9, line 1 - line 6 * * page 9, line 24 - page 10, line 9 * * page 10, line 19 - line 22 * * page 11, line 8 - page 12, line 24 * * page 13, line 14 - line 23 * * page 16, line 1 - line 5 * [A] 1-13,23-25;
 [X]  - KARCHI Z ET AL, "The importance of cultural practices in materializing yield potential in a tetraploid watermelon cultivar", CUCURBIT GENETICS COOPERATIVE REPORT, (1983), no. 6, pages 59 - 61, XP002972832 [X] 26,27 * table 1 *
 [A]  - SUNDSTROM F J ET AL, "INFLUENCE OF POTASSIUM AND CALCIUM ON QUALITY AND YIELD OF WATERMELON CITRULLUS-LANATUS CULTIVAR CALHOUN-GRAY", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR HORTICULTURAL SCIENCE, (1983), vol. 108, no. 5, ISSN 0003-1062, pages 879 - 881, XP008045716 [A] 1-13,23-27 * abstract * * page 879, column L, paragraph 5 - paragraph 6 * * page 880, column R, paragraph 2; table 2 *
 [A]  - SCOTT W D ET AL, "CALCIUM FERTILIZATION AND CULTIVAR AFFECT WATERMELON RIND THICKNESS AND RESILIENCY", HORTSCIENCE, & 87TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR HORTICULTURAL SCIENCE, TUCSON, ARIZONA, USA, NOVEMBE, (1990), vol. 25, no. 9, ISSN 0018-5345, page 1075, XP008045717 [A] 1-13,23-27 * abstract *
 [L]  - KANO YASUTAKA, "Effects of summer day-time temperature on sugar content in several portions of watermelon fruit (Citrullus lanatus).", JOURNAL OF HORTICULTURAL SCIENCE & BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200401), vol. 79, no. 1, ISSN 1462-0316, pages 142 - 145, XP008045770 [L] 1-13,23-27 * abstract *
 [A]  - BUTTROSE M S ET AL, "SOME EFFECTS OF LIGHT INTENSITY DAY LENGTH AND TEMPERATURE ON GROWTH OF FRUITING AND NONFRUITING WATERMELON CITRULLUS-LANATUS", ANNALS OF BOTANY (LONDON), (1978), vol. 42, no. 179, ISSN 0305-7364, pages 599 - 608, XP008045733 [A] 1-13,23-27 * abstract * * page 600, paragraph 3 * * page 602 - page 604 *
 [A]  - HEGDE D M, "PHYSIOLOGICAL ANALYSIS OF GROWTH AND YIELD OF WATERMELON CITRULLUS-LANATUS THUNB MUSF IN RELATION TO IRRIGATION AND NITROGEN FERTILIZATION", JOURNAL OF AGRONOMY AND CROP SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 160, no. 5, ISSN 0931-2250, pages 296 - 302, XP008045736 [A] 1-13,23-27 * abstract *
 [A]  - SUGIYAMA KEITA ET AL, "Relationship between rind hardness and rind tissue structure in watermelon", JOURNAL OF THE JAPANESE SOCIETY FOR HORTICULTURAL SCIENCE, (199901), vol. 68, no. 1, ISSN 0013-7626, pages 108 - 116, XP008045718 [A] 1-13,23-27 * abstract *
 [A]  - FAN MIN ET AL, "Identification of quantitative trait loci associated with fruit traits in watermelon (Citullus lanantus (Thanb) Mansf) and analysis of their genetic effects", ACTA GENETICA SINICA, (2000), vol. 27, no. 10, ISSN 0379-4172, pages 902 - 910, XP008045647 [A] 1-13,23-27 * abstract *
International search[XP]US6355865  ;
 [X]  - CRALL J.M. ET AL, "SSDL: a high-quality icebox watermelon breeding line resistant to fusarium wilt and antracnose", HORTSCIENCE, (199406), vol. 29, no. 6, pages 707 - 708, XP002978587
 [X]  - MAYNARD ET AL, "Triploid Watermelon production practices and varieties", ACTA HORTICULTURE, (1992), vol. 318, pages 169 - 178, XP002966111
 [X]  - NESMITH ET AL, "Fruit set of triploid watermelons as a function of distance from a diploid pollenizer", HORTSCIENCE, (200102), vol. 36, no. 1, pages 60 - 61, XP002978588