Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1480685

EP1480685 - PORTABLE RADIANT ENERGY STERILIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.11.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.12.2005  [2005/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STERIS INC.
43425 Business Park Drive
Temecula, CA 92590 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/49]For all designated states
STERIS INC.
43425 Business Park Drive
Temecula, California 92590 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KORENEV, Sergey, A.
328 Bingham Circle
Mundelein, IL 60060 / US
 [2004/49]
Representative(s)Leineweber, Jürgen , et al
Patentanwalt
Siebachstrasse 47
50733 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/49]Leineweber, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Aggerstrasse 24
50859 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date03744185.403.03.2003
[2004/49]
WO2003US06671
Priority number, dateUS2002009057304.03.2002         Original published format: US 90573
[2004/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03075964
Date:18.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1480685
Date:01.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003
[2004/49]
Search report(s)International search reportEP18.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61L2/08, A62D3/00, B65B55/02, B65B55/08, H01J3/02, H01J33/02, H01J37/00, G21K5/04
[2004/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRAGBARES STRAHLUNGSENERGIESTERILISATIONSGERÄT[2005/07]
English:PORTABLE RADIANT ENERGY STERILIZER[2004/49]
French:STERILISATEUR PORTABLE A RAYONNEMENT D'ENERGIE[2004/49]
Former [2004/49]TRAGBARER STRAHLENENERGIESTABILISATOR
Entry into regional phase01.09.2004National basic fee paid 
01.09.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
01.09.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/49]
10.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/52]
28.07.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US4931700  (REED JAY L [US]) [X] 1-9,14-20 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 60 * * column 3, line 16 - column 5, line 47; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]US5079482  (VILLECCO ROGER A [US], et al) [X] 1-9,14-20 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 46 * * column 3, line 7 - column 7, line 65; figures 1-4,7-9 *;
 [X]WO0069231  (SCANDITRONIX MEDICAL AB [SE]) [X] 1-9,14-20 * page 4, line 13 - page 14, line 17; figures 1-8 *;
 [Y]US3779706  (NABLO S) [Y] 24-26 * column 1, line 4 - line 14 * * column 2, line 18 - line 35 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 31; claims 1,4 *;
 [Y]US5077771  (SKILLICORN BRIAN [US], et al) [Y] 10,11,23 * column 6, line 5 - column 7, line 49; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US3144552  (SCHONBERG RUSSELL G, et al) [Y] 12,13,21,22 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 29 * * column 2, line 71 - column 4, line 69 * * column 6, line 74 - column 7, line 40; figures 1,2,2A,3-5 *;
 [Y]US3463959  (JORY HOWARD R, et al) [Y] 12,13,21,22 * column 1, line 17 - line 26 * * column 4, line 5 - line 71; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO0114911  (STERIS INC [US]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENTS AND PROSPECTS OF STERILIZATION BY IONIZING RADIATION, MONTREAL, QUEBEC, CANADA, MULTISCIENCE PUBLICATIONS, CANADA, XP002245866 [X] 1-9,14-20 * S. B VASSERMANN: "ELIT TYPE PULSE ELECTRON ACCELERATORS BASED ON A TESLA TRANSFORMER"; page 44 - page 50 * [Y] 10-13,21-26