Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1485393

EP1485393 - 9-DEXO-9A-AZA-9A-METHYL-9A-HOMOERYTHROMYCIN A DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.06.2010
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PLIVA HRVATSKA d.o.o.
Ulica grada Vukovara 49
10000 Zagreb / HR
[2009/02]
Former [2005/38]For all designated states
Pliva Istrazivanje i Razvoj d.o.o.
Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29
10000 Zagreb / HR
Former [2004/51]For all designated states
Pliva - Istrazivacki Institut d.o.o.
Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29
10000 Zagreb / HR
Inventor(s)01 / DUMIC, Miljenko
Ivane Brlic Mazuranic 4
10000 Zagreb / HR
02 / VINKOVIC, Mladen
Senoina 3, Senkovec
40000 Cakovec / HR
03 / ORESIC, Marina
Ulica Orhideja 5
10360 Sesvete / HR
04 / MESTROVIC, Ernest
Ivana Grange 41
43000 Bjelovar / HR
05 / DANILOVSKI, Aleksandar
Rastocine 4/VI
51000 Rijeka / HR
06 / DUMBOVIC, Alojz
Rudeska cesta 162
10000 Zagreb / HR
07 / KNEZEVIC, Zdravka
Sijecanjska 17
10000 Zagreb / HR
08 / LAZAREVSKI, Gorjana
Barutanski Jarak 18
10000 Zagreb / HR
09 / CINCIC, Dominik
Josipa Brunsmida 1
10000 Zagreb / HR
10 / FILIC, Darko
Marice Baric 17
10000 Zagreb / HR
11 / LAZARIC, Katica
Side Kosutic 12
10000 Zagreb / HR
12 / BUCAR, Dejan-Kresimir
Kumrovecka 72
10294 Pusca / HR
 [2004/51]
Representative(s)McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell , et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2006/23]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell , et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2004/51]Schrell, Andreas, Dr. , et al
Gleiss & Grosse Leitzstrasse 45
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date03744475.918.03.2003
[2004/51]
WO2003IB00987
Priority number, dateHR2002000003118.03.2002         Original published format: HR 20020031
US20020393612P03.07.2002         Original published format: US 393612 P
US20020394705P08.07.2002         Original published format: US 394705 P
[2004/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03077830
Date:25.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1485393
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003
[2004/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1485393
Date:19.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:C07H17/00, A61K31/70, A61P33/02, A61P31/04, C07H17/08
[2004/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/51]
Extension statesAL15.11.2004
LT15.11.2004
LV15.11.2004
MK15.11.2004
TitleGerman:9-DEXO-9A-AZA-9A-METHYL-9A-HOMOERYTHROMYCIN A DERIVATEN[2004/51]
English:9-DEXO-9A-AZA-9A-METHYL-9A-HOMOERYTHROMYCIN A DERIVATIVES[2004/51]
French:PSEUDOPOLYMORPHES ISOSTRUCTURAUX DE 9-DESOXO-9A-AZA-9A-METHYL-9A-HOMOERYTHROMYCINE A[2004/51]
Entry into regional phase18.10.2004National basic fee paid 
15.11.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.10.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.11.2004Examination requested  [2005/02]
13.10.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2009Fee for grant paid
07.04.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05023731.2  / EP1627883
Opposition(s)20.05.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
06.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.08.2009
BE19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
SK19.08.2009
TR19.08.2009
BG19.11.2009
GR20.11.2009
PT21.12.2009
HU20.02.2010
GB18.03.2010
IE18.03.2010
LU18.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
FR31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/43]AT19.08.2009
BE19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
SK19.08.2009
BG19.11.2009
GR20.11.2009
PT21.12.2009
HU20.02.2010
GB18.03.2010
IE18.03.2010
LU18.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
FR31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
Former [2012/42]AT19.08.2009
BE19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
SK19.08.2009
BG19.11.2009
GR20.11.2009
PT21.12.2009
HU20.02.2010
GB18.03.2010
IE18.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
FR31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
Former [2011/17]AT19.08.2009
BE19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
SK19.08.2009
BG19.11.2009
GR20.11.2009
PT21.12.2009
GB18.03.2010
IE18.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
FR31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
Former [2011/10]AT19.08.2009
BE19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
SK19.08.2009
BG19.11.2009
GR20.11.2009
PT21.12.2009
IE18.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
FR31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
Former [2011/07]AT19.08.2009
BE19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
SK19.08.2009
BG19.11.2009
GR20.11.2009
PT21.12.2009
IE18.03.2010
FR31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
Former [2010/46]AT19.08.2009
BE19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
SK19.08.2009
BG19.11.2009
GR20.11.2009
PT21.12.2009
MC31.03.2010
Former [2010/28]AT19.08.2009
BE19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
SK19.08.2009
BG19.11.2009
PT21.12.2009
Former [2010/23]AT19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
SK19.08.2009
BG19.11.2009
PT21.12.2009
Former [2010/22]AT19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
BG19.11.2009
PT21.12.2009
Former [2010/20]AT19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
BG19.11.2009
PT21.12.2009
Former [2010/18]AT19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
BG19.11.2009
PT21.12.2009
Former [2010/16]AT19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
PT21.12.2009
Former [2010/11]AT19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
Former [2010/10]AT19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
Former [2010/09]AT19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
Former [2010/08]AT19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
Cited inInternational search[E]WO03053399  (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [E] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0215842  (WOCKHARDT LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1-30 * example 5 *;
 [X]WO9958541  (BIOCHEMIE SA [ES], et al) [X] 1-30 * examples 1-9 *;
 [X]WO0210144  (SILANES SA DE CV LAB [MX], et al) [X] 1-30 * figures 1,2; claims 1-5 *;
 [X]EP1103558  (ASTUR PHARMA SA [ES]) [X] 1-30 * page 2, line 1 - page 4, column 42; claims 1-10 *;
 [X]WO0149697  (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [X] 1-30 * examples 1,3 *;
 [X]WO0100640  (BIOCHEMIE SA [ES], et al) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0032203  (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [X] 1-30 * example 1; claims 1-15 *;
 [X]EP0984020  (APOTEX INC [CA]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0827965  (ASTUR PHARMA SA [ES]) [X] 1-30 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0298650  (PFIZER [US]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0187912  (ERCROS IND SA [ES], et al) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6268489  (ALLEN DOUGLAS J M [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * column W *