blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1487521 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1487521



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 224
12.03.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.03.2008 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
26.02.2008 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
15.11.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
20.09.2007 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
03.09.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.09.2007 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
05.06.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.06.2007 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
04.05.2007 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
10.11.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.11.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
28.09.2004 Annex Search / examination 1
28.09.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
13.08.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
20.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45
20.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 63
09.10.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
09.10.2003 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 46
14.07.2003 Notification relating to priority claim Search / examination 1