blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1487521


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.02.2008 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  02.04.2008  [2008/14]
09.11.2007 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
31.08.2007 Supplementary search report published on  03.10.2007  [2007/40]
01.05.2007 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
06.04.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.04.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.11.2004 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.12.2004  [2004/52]
05.11.2004 Request for examination filed published on  22.12.2004  [2004/52]
19.10.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
06.10.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
06.10.2004 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
01.10.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
28.02.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
15.10.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
11.10.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
10.10.2003 PCT data prior to European publication