blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1487521
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2004093709Global Dossier 09.06.2005A3
WO2004093709 04.11.2004A2
Priority number Date
US39754503 25.03.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2005521481Global Dossier 21.07.2005A
Priority number Date
US10639702 26.03.2002
US27822502 21.10.2002
US0309028 26.03.2003
US39754503 25.03.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1487521Global Dossier 03.10.2007A4
EP1487521 22.12.2004A1
Priority number Date
US10639702 26.03.2002
US27822502 21.10.2002
US0309028 26.03.2003
US39754503 25.03.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003225967B 01.06.2006B2
AU2003225967 13.10.2003A1
Priority number Date
US10639702 26.03.2002
US27822502 21.10.2002
US0309028 26.03.2003
US39754503 25.03.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6972008 06.12.2005B2
US2004078006 22.04.2004A1
Priority number Date
US27822502 21.10.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7169134 30.01.2007B2
US2003187407 02.10.2003A1
Priority number Date
US10639702 26.03.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO03082382Global Dossier 09.10.2003A1
Priority number Date
US10639702 26.03.2002
US27822502 21.10.2002
US39754503 25.03.2003
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US7198619Global Dossier 03.04.2007B2
US2003212372 13.11.2003A1
Priority number Date
US10639702 26.03.2002
US27822502 21.10.2002
US39754503 25.03.2003