Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1487521

EP1487521 - VALVE SYRINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.02.2008
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.02.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.04.2008  [2008/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ultradent Products, Inc.
505 West 10200 South South Jordan
Utah 84095 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/52]For all designated states
Ultradent Products, Inc.
505 West 10200 South
South Jordan, Utah 84095 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BILLS, Dan, J.
7636 South Steffensen Drive
Salt Lake City, UT 84121 / US
02 / FISCHER, Dan, E.
10444 South Dimple Dell Road
Sandy, UT 84093 / US
03 / McLEAN, Bruce, S.
12091 South Millridge Road
Sandy, UT 84094 / US
 [2004/52]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/52]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03745581.326.03.2003
[2004/52]
WO2003US09028
Priority number, dateUS2002010639726.03.2002         Original published format: US 106397
US2002027822521.10.2002         Original published format: US 278225
US2003039754525.03.2003         Original published format: US 397545
[2004/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03082382
Date:09.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1487521
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003
[2004/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.10.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/315
[2004/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/52]
Extension statesAL28.09.2004
LT28.09.2004
LV28.09.2004
MK28.09.2004
TitleGerman:VENTILSPRITZE[2004/52]
English:VALVE SYRINGE[2004/52]
French:SERINGUE A SOUPAPE[2004/52]
Entry into regional phase28.09.2004National basic fee paid 
28.09.2004Search fee paid 
28.09.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/52]
02.10.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/14]
15.11.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4993948  (CAMERON FREDERICK J [US], et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5178186  (LEVASSEUR JOSEPH E [US]) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 37 - column 4, line 53 * * figures 6,7 *;
 [A]WO9603934  (CAMERON FREDERICK [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5951160  (RONK ROBERT [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 18 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 14 * * figures 1,2; claims 3,4,7-9 *;
 [A]EP0317073  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[A]US5286257  (FISCHER DAN E [US])