Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1492967

EP1492967 - ROBOT WITH A LINE GUIDANCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.04.2010
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
13.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabelschlepp GmbH
Daimlerstraße 2
57482 Wenden-Gerlingen / DE
[2009/39]
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
Kabelschlepp GmbH
Marienborner Strasse 75
57074 Siegen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WEHLER, Herbert
Heinrichsglücker Weg 3
57290 Neunkirchen / DE
02 / KEMPER, Uwe
Glück-Auf-Str. 30
57223 Kreuztal / DE
 [2005/01]
Representative(s)KNH Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB
Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/14]Neumann, Ditmar , et al
KNH Patentanwälte
Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine
Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2005/01]Neumann, Ditmar
Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Karlstrasse 76
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date03745774.428.03.2003
[2005/01]
WO2003EP03265
Priority number, dateDE2002101608111.04.2002         Original published format: DE 10216081
[2005/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03084721
Date:16.10.2003
Language:DE
[2003/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1492967
Date:05.01.2005
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2003
[2005/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1492967
Date:02.06.2010
Language:DE
[2010/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:B25J19/00, F16G13/16, H02G11/00
[2016/04]
Former International [2010/01]B25J19/00
Former International [2005/01]F16G13/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2010/22]
Former [2005/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROBOTER MIT EINER LEITUNGSFÜHRUNGSEINRICHTUNG[2005/01]
English:ROBOT WITH A LINE GUIDANCE DEVICE[2005/01]
French:ROBOT COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE DE LIGNES[2005/01]
Entry into regional phase15.10.2004National basic fee paid 
15.10.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.10.2004Examination requested  [2005/01]
08.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.04.2010Fee for grant paid
21.04.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10164518.2  / EP2226164
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.02.2011  08.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
igus GmbH
Spicher Strasse 1a
51147 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte, et al
Partnerschaft mbB
Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 [2018/17]
Former [2011/14]
Opponent(s)01  25.02.2011   
igus GmbH
Spicher Strasse 1a
51147 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Stachow, Ernst-Walther, et al
Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
06.04.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.08.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
08.02.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition08.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0557/16
20.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
17.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE02.06.2010
GB28.03.2011
FR31.03.2011
[2015/21]
Former [2010/49]SE02.06.2010
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO0109532  (IGUS GMBH) [Y] 1-5,9-14 * abstract * * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 11 * * page 5, line 29 - line 33 *;
 [Y]FR1365129  (AVICA EQUIP) [Y] 1-5,9-11 * figures 1-5 * * page 1, column L, lines 1-3 * * page 1, column L, line 15 - column R, line 10 * * page 1, column R, lines 27-38 * * page 2, column L, lines 4-39 *;
 [Y]EP0979967  (KUKA ROBOTER GMBH) [Y] 12-14 * abstract *;
 [A]US4840023  (BORSANI PAOLO) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - line 38 *;
 [A]WO9635887  (MOECKL ERNST) [A] 1-3,9-11 * abstract * * page 11, line 6 *;
 [A]EP0875695  (KABELSCHLEPP GMBH) [A] 1-3,9,10 * abstract *