EP1498637 - VIBRATION CONTROL EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | ||
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEKI, Akira, @c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8430 / JP | [2014/07] |
Former [2005/03] | 01 /
UEKI, Akira, c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8430 / JP | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2012/49] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2012/17] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/03] | Whalley, Kevin MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 03747223.0 | 24.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003JP05234 | Priority number, date | JP20020123763 | 25.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002123763 | [2005/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03091597 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1498637 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1498637 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/26 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
F16F13/107 (EP,US);
F16F13/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2005/03] | Title | German: | SCHWINGUNGSSTEUERUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2005/03] | English: | VIBRATION CONTROL EQUIPMENT | [2005/03] | French: | EQUIPEMENT DE COMMANDE DES VIBRATIONS | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2004 | Translation filed | 26.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 27.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 20.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5246211 (KLEIN ROBERT R [US], et al) [X] 1-7* figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPS6073147 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JPS60227032 (TOYODA GOSEI KK, et al); | [A]JPS63152936U ; | [A]JPH01193425 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD); | [A]JPH02119540U |