Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1500799

EP1500799 - HONEYCOMB FILTER FOR CLARIFYING EXHAUST GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  28.02.2014
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.2014Revocation of patentpublished on 02.04.2014  [2014/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IBIDEN CO., LTD.
1, Kanda-cho 2-chome
Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken 503 / JP
[2007/43]
Former [2005/04]For all designated states
IBIDEN CO., LTD.
1, Kanda-cho 2-chome
Ogaki-shi Gifu-ken 503 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMADA, Keiji c/o IBIDEN CO., LTD. Ogakikita Kojo
1-1, Kitagata, Ibigawacho
Ibi-gun, Gifu 501-0695 / JP
 [2005/04]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/24]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2010/49]Renken, Joachim , et al
Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2010/48]Wiedemann, Peter , et al
Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2006/37]Uchida, Kenji
Cabinet Fedit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2005/04]Hart Davis, Jason , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date03747537.309.04.2003
[2005/04]
WO2003JP04480
Priority number, dateJP2002010971711.04.2002         Original published format: JP 2002109717
[2005/04]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03093658
Date:13.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1500799
Date:26.01.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2003
[2005/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1500799
Date:24.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.11.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:F01N3/02, F01N3/28, B01J35/04
[2005/18]
Former International [2005/04]F01N3/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/04]
TitleGerman:WABENFILTER ZUR REINIGUNG VON ABGAS[2005/04]
English:HONEYCOMB FILTER FOR CLARIFYING EXHAUST GAS[2005/04]
French:FILTRE EN NID D'ABEILLE POUR CLARIFIER DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT[2005/04]
Entry into regional phase19.10.2004Translation filed 
18.10.2004National basic fee paid 
18.10.2004Search fee paid 
18.10.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.10.2004Examination requested  [2005/04]
20.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2007Fee for grant paid
05.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.07.2008  14.03.2012  WITHDRAWN
Saint-Gobain Centre de Recherches et d'Etudes Européen
18 Avenue d'Alsace
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Opponent's representative
Teyssedre, Laurent, et al
Saint-Gobain Recherche
Département Propriété Industrielle
39 Quai Lucien Lefranc
93300 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2012/16]
Opponent(s)01  21.07.2008  14.03.2012  WITHDRAWN
Saint-Gobain Centre de Recherches et d'Etudes Européen
18 Avenue d'Alsace
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Opponent's representative
Teyssedre, Laurent, et al
Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc B.P. 135
93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
Former [2009/49]
Opponent(s)01  21.07.2008  30.07.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Saint-Gobain Centre de Recherches et D'Etudes Europeen SAS
18 Avenue d'Alsace
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Opponent's representative
Teyssedre, Laurent, et al
Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc B.P. 135
93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
Former [2008/35]
Opponent(s)01  21.07.2008   
Saint-Gobain Centre de Recherches et D'Etudes Europeen SAS
18 Avenue d'Alsace
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Opponent's representative
Lucas, Francois
Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc B.P. 135
F-93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
01.09.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.02.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.04.2010Date of oral proceedings
28.05.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.06.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
04.12.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/14]
Appeal following opposition27.07.2010Appeal received No.  T1616/10
29.09.2010Statement of grounds filed
04.12.2013Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
04.12.2013Date of oral proceedings
11.12.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.10.2007
BE24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
CY24.10.2007
CZ24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
EE24.10.2007
FI24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
RO24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
SK24.10.2007
TR24.10.2007
BG24.01.2008
SE24.01.2008
GR25.01.2008
PT24.03.2008
IE09.04.2008
LU09.04.2008
HU25.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
[2010/37]
Former [2010/34]AT24.10.2007
BE24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
CY24.10.2007
CZ24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
EE24.10.2007
FI24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
RO24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
SK24.10.2007
BG24.01.2008
SE24.01.2008
GR25.01.2008
PT24.03.2008
IE09.04.2008
LU09.04.2008
HU25.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2010/32]AT24.10.2007
BE24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
CY24.10.2007
CZ24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
EE24.10.2007
FI24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
RO24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
SK24.10.2007
BG24.01.2008
SE24.01.2008
GR25.01.2008
PT24.03.2008
IE09.04.2008
LU09.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2009/34]AT24.10.2007
BE24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
CY24.10.2007
CZ24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
EE24.10.2007
FI24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
RO24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
SK24.10.2007
BG24.01.2008
SE24.01.2008
GR25.01.2008
PT24.03.2008
IE09.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2009/23]AT24.10.2007
BE24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
CZ24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
EE24.10.2007
FI24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
RO24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
SK24.10.2007
BG24.01.2008
SE24.01.2008
GR25.01.2008
PT24.03.2008
IE09.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2009/11]AT24.10.2007
BE24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
CZ24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
EE24.10.2007
FI24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
RO24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
SK24.10.2007
BG24.01.2008
SE24.01.2008
GR25.01.2008
PT24.03.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2008/51]AT24.10.2007
BE24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
CZ24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
RO24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
SK24.10.2007
BG24.01.2008
SE24.01.2008
PT24.03.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2008/39]AT24.10.2007
BE24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
CZ24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
RO24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
SK24.10.2007
BG24.01.2008
SE24.01.2008
PT24.03.2008
Former [2008/35]AT24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
CZ24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
BG24.01.2008
SE24.01.2008
PT24.03.2008
Former [2008/29]AT24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
BG24.01.2008
SE24.01.2008
PT24.03.2008
Former [2008/26]CH24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
BG24.01.2008
SE24.01.2008
PT24.03.2008
Former [2008/24]CH24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
BG24.01.2008
SE24.01.2008
PT24.03.2008
Documents cited:Search[DPX]EP1251247  (DENSO CORPORATION) [DPX] 1-3 * figure -; claim -; tables 1,2 *
International search[X]US5595581  ;
 [Y]JPH09173866  ;
 [Y]JP2001073743  ;
 [A]JPS6162217U