Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1500799 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1500799



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1848
20.10.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
08.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.02.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.02.2014 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.02.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.02.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 18
11.12.2013 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
20.11.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
18.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.10.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
10.10.2013 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
07.10.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.05.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
09.05.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Appeal 1
03.05.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
20.03.2012 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 2
14.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.03.2012 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
14.03.2012 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
12.01.2012 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
04.02.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.01.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
21.01.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 43
08.11.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
27.10.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
14.10.2010 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
05.10.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.09.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.09.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 21
29.09.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 21
29.09.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
03.08.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
30.07.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
28.07.2010 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
27.07.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.06.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.06.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.06.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.06.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.06.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.06.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
11.06.2010 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
11.06.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 20
11.06.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.06.2010 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
02.06.2010 Claims Opposition 2
02.06.2010 Claims Opposition 4
02.06.2010 Claims Opposition 2
02.06.2010 Claims Opposition 2
02.06.2010 Claims Opposition 2
02.06.2010 Claims Opposition 2
02.06.2010 Claims Opposition 2
02.06.2010 Claims Opposition 2
02.06.2010 Claims Opposition 2
02.06.2010 Claims Opposition 4
02.06.2010 Claims Opposition 2
02.06.2010 Claims Opposition 4
02.06.2010 Claims Opposition 2
02.06.2010 Claims Opposition 10
02.06.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
02.06.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
02.06.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
02.06.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.06.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.06.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.06.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
02.06.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
02.06.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
02.06.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
28.05.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
28.05.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.05.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
28.05.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.05.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.05.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.05.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.04.2010 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
15.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.04.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
14.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
14.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
14.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
14.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
14.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
14.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
14.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
14.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
14.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
14.04.2010 Claims Opposition 3
14.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.04.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
12.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
12.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
09.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
08.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
08.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
08.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
08.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
08.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
08.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
06.04.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
06.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.04.2010 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 22
01.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
25.03.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
25.03.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
25.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
25.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
25.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
25.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
24.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.03.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 3
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 3
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 3
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 3
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 19
18.03.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 19
18.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
18.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
19.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.11.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.11.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.11.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.11.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 45
29.10.2009 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.10.2009 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
13.10.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.10.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.10.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.10.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.10.2009 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
05.10.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
05.10.2009 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.10.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.10.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.03.2009 Claims Opposition 1
02.03.2009 Claims Opposition 1
02.03.2009 Claims Opposition 1
02.03.2009 Claims Opposition 10
02.03.2009 Claims Opposition 1
02.03.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
26.02.2009 Claims Opposition 1
26.02.2009 Claims Opposition 1
26.02.2009 Claims Opposition 1
26.02.2009 Claims Opposition 1
26.02.2009 Claims Opposition 1
26.02.2009 Description Opposition 9
26.02.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
14.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
31.12.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.12.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.10.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
06.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.09.2008 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 3
01.09.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
06.08.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.07.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 12
22.07.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
22.07.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.07.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
22.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
22.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
22.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
22.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
22.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
21.07.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 10
21.07.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 1
21.07.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 3
21.07.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.07.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
21.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
21.07.2008 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
27.09.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.09.2007 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
13.09.2007 Translation of priority document Search / examination 62
05.09.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.09.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
05.09.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.06.2007 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
21.06.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
21.06.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
21.06.2007 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
21.06.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 77
16.08.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.08.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.08.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
15.07.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.07.2006 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
13.07.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.07.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.04.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
27.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
27.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
27.04.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.04.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.12.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
20.12.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.07.2005 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.05.2005 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
24.03.2005 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
17.03.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.03.2005 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
10.01.2005 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
10.01.2005 Annex Search / examination 1
10.01.2005 Description Search / examination 1
07.01.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
15.12.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
22.11.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
19.10.2004 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.10.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
19.10.2004 Description Search / examination 68
19.10.2004 Drawings Search / examination 7
19.10.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
17.09.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
25.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 52
13.11.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
13.11.2003 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
13.11.2003 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 60