Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1542670

EP1542670 - COMPOSITION CONTAINING ARACHIDONIC ACID ALONE OR IN COMBINATION WITH DOCOSAHEXAENOIC ACID FOR ENHANCING COGNITIVE ABILITIES IN ADULTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/25]COMPOSITION CONTAINING ARACHIDONIC ACID ALONE OR IN COMBINATION WITH DOCOSAHEXAENOIC ACID FOR ENHANCING COGNITIVE ABILITIES
[2012/37]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.04.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2018Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Suntory Holdings Limited
1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome, Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8203 / JP
[2009/30]
Former [2005/25]For all designated states
SUNTORY LIMITED
1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8203 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / AKIMOTO, Kengo
2-75-404 Idasugiyama-cho
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-0036 / JP
02 / KOGA, Yoshihiko
2-4-5, Kaminoge
Setagaya-ku, Tokyo 158-0093 / JP
 [2013/20]
Former [2005/40]01 / AKIMOTO, Kengo
2-75-404 Idasugiyama-cho Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-0036 / JP
02 / KOGA, Yoshihiko
2-4-5, Kaminoge
Setagaya-ku, Tokyo 158-0093 / JP
Former [2005/25]01 / AKIMOTO, Kengo
1-9-5-1006, Yamazaki, Shimamoto-cho
Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0001 / JP
02 / KOGA, Yoshihiko
2-4-5, Kaminoge
Setagaya-ku, Tokyo 158-0093 / JP
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/20]Stoner, Gerard Patrick , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [2005/25]Stoner, Gerard Patrick , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date03748553.922.09.2003
[2005/25]
WO2003JP12107
Priority number, dateJP2002027730524.09.2002         Original published format: JP 2002277305
[2005/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004028529
Date:08.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1542670
Date:22.06.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004
[2005/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1542670
Date:15.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/202, A61P25/28, A23L1/30
[2012/37]
Former International [2005/25]A61K31/202, A61P25/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/25]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, ENHALTEND ARACHIDONSAEURE ALLEIN ODER IN KOMBINATION MIT DOCOSAHEXAENSAEURE ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER KOGNITIVEN FûHIGKEITEN BEI ERWACHSENEN.[2012/37]
English:COMPOSITION CONTAINING ARACHIDONIC ACID ALONE OR IN COMBINATION WITH DOCOSAHEXAENOIC ACID FOR ENHANCING COGNITIVE ABILITIES IN ADULTS[2012/37]
French:COMPOSITION CONTENANT DE L'ACIDE ARACHIDONIQUE SEUL OU EN COMBINAISON AVEC DE L'ACIDE DOCOSAHEXANOIQUE UTILE POUR AMELIORER LES CAPACITES COGNITIVES CHEZ L'ADULTE[2012/37]
Former [2005/25]ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DIE NUR ARACHIDONSûURE ODER ARACHIDONSûURE IN KOMBINATION MIT DOCOSAHEXAENSûURE ENTHûLT, ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER KOGNITIVEN FûHIGKEITEN
Former [2005/25]COMPOSITION CONTAINING ARACHIDONIC ACID ALONE OR IN COMBINATION WITH DOCOSAHEXAENOIC ACID FOR ENHANCING COGNITIVE ABILITIES
Former [2005/25]COMPOSITION CONTENANT DE L'ACIDE ARACHIDONIQUE SEUL OU EN COMBINAISON AVEC DE L'ACIDE DOCOSAHEXANOIQUE UTILE POUR AMELIORER LES CAPACITES COGNITIVES
Entry into regional phase08.04.2005National basic fee paid 
08.04.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.04.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/25]
13.06.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2013Fee for grant paid
27.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.06.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.02.2014  24.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
Opponent's representative
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2014/13]
Opponent(s)01  17.02.2014   
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
Opponent's representative
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
24.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
12.01.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.01.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition10.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0626/17
18.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
21.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
20.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
20.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
21.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.09.2003
CZ15.05.2013
EE15.05.2013
RO15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
SK15.05.2013
TR15.05.2013
BG15.08.2013
CY22.09.2016
LU22.09.2016
MC30.09.2016
[2017/47]
Former [2017/31]HU22.09.2003
CZ15.05.2013
EE15.05.2013
RO15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
SK15.05.2013
TR15.05.2013
BG15.08.2013
CY22.09.2016
MC30.09.2016
Former [2015/34]HU22.09.2003
CZ15.05.2013
EE15.05.2013
RO15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
SK15.05.2013
TR15.05.2013
BG15.08.2013
Former [2015/32]CZ15.05.2013
EE15.05.2013
RO15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
SK15.05.2013
TR15.05.2013
BG15.08.2013
Former [2014/11]CZ15.05.2013
EE15.05.2013
RO15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
SK15.05.2013
BG15.08.2013
Former [2014/10]CZ15.05.2013
EE15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
SK15.05.2013
BG15.08.2013
Former [2013/50]SI15.05.2013
BG15.08.2013
Former [2013/49]SI15.05.2013
Cited inInternational search[XY]US6080787  (DOHNALEK MARGARET H ET AL) [X] 1,2,6,13-21,29-35 * column 13, lines 39-48; claims 1-7,16,17,25 * [Y] 1-35;
 [XY]WO9610922  (MILUPA AG ;KOHN GERHARD (DE); SAWATZKI GUENTHER (DE); SCHWEIKHARDT) [X] 1,2,6,13-21,29-35 * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 34; claims 1-4 * [Y] 1-35;
 [XY]US6034130  (BERTHOLET RAYMOND ET AL) [X] 1-7,9-35 * column 2, lines 18-61; example 1; claims 1,8; table 3 * [Y] 1-35;
 [X]EP1239022  (NESTLE SA) [X] 1,2,6,33-35 * claims 1-3,10-14 *;
 [XY]WO9621037  (MARTEK BIOSCIENCES CORP ;KYLE DAVID J (US)) [X] 1,2,6-9,13-21,33-35 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 14; claims 1-34 * [Y] 1-35;
 [X]US4668704  (TARNAWSKI ANDRZEJ S ET AL) [X] 1,6,33-35 * column 2, lines 6-52 *;
 [XY]  - KOLETZKO B ET AL, "Polyunsaturated fatty acids in human milk and their role in early infant development.", JOURNAL OF MAMMARY GLAND BIOLOGY AND NEOPLASIA. UNITED STATES JUL 1999, (199907), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 1083-3021, pages 269 - 284, XP009024376 [X] 1-3,6,7,10,13-22,25,29,30,33-35 * page 270, column R, paragraph 1; table 1 * [Y] 1-35

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1018749913421
 [Y]  - CARLSON S E, "Docosahexaenoic acid and arachidonic acid in infant development.", SEMINARS IN NEONATOLOGY: SN. ENGLAND OCT 2001, (200110), vol. 6, no. 5, ISSN 1084-2756, pages 437 - 449, XP008024374 [Y] 1-35 * abstract * * p. 438, "Effects of essential fatty acid deficiency on brain composition and function" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b108091c
 [Y]  - AUESTAD NANCY ET AL, "Visual, cognitive, and language assessments at 39 months: a follow-up study of children fed formulas containing long-chain polyunsaturated fatty acids to 1 year of age.", PEDIATRICS. UNITED STATES SEP 2003, (200309), vol. 112, no. 3 Pt 1, ISSN 1098-4275, pages e177 - e183, XP009024347 [Y] 1-35 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1542/peds.112.3.e177
 [Y]  - WILLATTS P ET AL, "Effect of long-chain polyunsaturated fatty acids in infant formula on problem solving at 10 months of age", LANCET, XX, XX, (19980829), vol. 352, no. 9129, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 688 - 691, XP004265590 [Y] 1-35 * page 690, column R, lines 1-7; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(97)11374-5
 [Y]  - LUCAS A A ET AL, "Efficacy and safety of long-chain polyunsaturated fatty acid supplementation of infant-formula milk: a randomised trial", LANCET, XX, XX, (19991204), vol. 354, no. 9194, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 1948 - 1954, XP004262925 [Y] 1-35 * page 1948, column R, paragraphs 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(99)02314-4
Examination   - MCGAHON B M ET AL, "Age-related changes in synaptic function: Analysis of the effect of dietary supplementation with [omega]-3 fatty acids", NEUROSCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0306-4522(99)00219-5, vol. 94, no. 1, ISSN 0306-4522, (19990901), pages 305 - 314, (19990913), XP009134730

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0306-4522(99)00219-5