Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1545718

EP1545718 - TEMPORARY GOLF CLUB SHAFT-COMPONENT CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.04.2014
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nike International Ltd.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
[2013/22]
Former [2006/39]For all designated states
NIKE International Ltd.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US
Former [2005/26]For all designated states
Burrows Golf, Inc.
25555 West Avenue Stanford
Valencia, CA 91355-1101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BURROWS, Bruce, D.
25555 West Avenue Stanford
Valencia, CA 91355-1101 / US
 [2005/26]
Representative(s)Madgwick, Paul Roland , et al
Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen
Postfach 86 06 29
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Madgwick, Paul Roland , et al
RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29
81633 München / DE
Former [2005/26]Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Ruschke Hartmann Becker Pienzenauerstrasse 2
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date03748963.017.07.2003
[2005/26]
WO2003US22781
Priority number, dateUS20020398548P24.07.2002         Original published format: US 398548 P
US20030438254P02.01.2003         Original published format: US 438254 P
US20030438040P02.01.2003         Original published format: US 438040 P
US20030467109P30.04.2003         Original published format: US 467109 P
[2005/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004009186
Date:29.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1545718
Date:29.06.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004
[2005/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1545718
Date:29.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.01.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:A63B53/02
[2005/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/26]
TitleGerman:VORÜBERGEHENDE SCHAFTKOMPONENTENVERBINDUNG FÜR GOLFSCHLÄGER[2005/26]
English:TEMPORARY GOLF CLUB SHAFT-COMPONENT CONNECTION[2005/26]
French:CONNEXION TEMPORAIRE TIGE DE BATON DE GOLF-COMPOSANT[2005/26]
Entry into regional phase24.02.2005National basic fee paid 
24.02.2005Search fee paid 
24.02.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
24.02.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.02.2005Examination requested  [2005/26]
02.03.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2013Fee for grant paid
18.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.10.2010
Opposition(s)03.03.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200503   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2006
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.07.2003
AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
IE17.07.2013
LU17.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
IE17.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2015/30]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
IE17.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/33]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
IE17.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/20]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/14]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT29.05.2013
ES09.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/47]PT30.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]US1634082  (CHARLES RIGBY) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [XY]GB392493  (SPALDING & BROS BRITISH LTD AG) [X] 1,2,4-16 * the whole document * [Y] 3;
 [Y]US3524646  (WHEELER HAROLD P) [Y] 3 * the whole document *;
 [X]GB2331464  (KUO WEN HAI [TW]) [X] 1-6,8-16 * page 4, line 12 - page 8, line 7; figure - *;
 [X]US2451262  (WATKINS WILLIAM B) [X] 1,2,12,13,15,16 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB443439  (GEORGE EDWARD BOWSER; WILLIAM HARDING) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2000024143  (ITO FUMIO)
International search[X]US4664382  ;
 [Y]US5275408  ;
 [Y]US4948132  ;
 [Y]US5433442  ;
 [Y]US6149533  ;
 [Y]US1792852