Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1547360

EP1547360 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MEMORY PVR FUNCTIONS IN A BROADCAST ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.05.2011
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InterDigital CE Patent Holdings
3 rue du Colonel Moll
75017 Paris / FR
[2019/10]
Former [2010/07]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Former [2005/40]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
Former [2005/26]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing S.A.
46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / LOCKRIDGE, Terry, Wayne
10350 Ruckle Street
Indianapolis, IN 46280 / US
 [2005/26]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
InterDigital CE Patent Holdings
20, rue Rouget de Lisle
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/11]Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR European Patent Operations 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Former [2011/29]Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte , et al
Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Former [2006/31]Lagrange, Jacques Etienne M.M.
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2005/26]Kohrs, Martin
Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo
92648 Boulogne-Billancourt Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date03749490.305.09.2003
[2005/26]
WO2003US27989
Priority number, dateUS20020408390P05.09.2002         Original published format: US 408390 P
[2005/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004023786
Date:18.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1547360
Date:29.06.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004
[2005/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.07.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/00
[2005/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2005/52]
Former [2005/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM F R SPEICHER-PVR-FUNKTIONEN IN EINER BROADCAST-UMGEBUNG[2005/26]
English:A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MEMORY PVR FUNCTIONS IN A BROADCAST ENVIRONMENT[2005/26]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE FONCTIONS PVR MEMOIRE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT DE DIFFUSION[2005/26]
Entry into regional phase21.03.2005National basic fee paid 
21.03.2005Search fee paid 
21.03.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/26]
01.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
04.11.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination19.12.2014Appeal received No.  T0689/15
12.03.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.12.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
24.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
24.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
26.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
24.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
23.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1161087  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * column 10, paragraph 53 - column 40, paragraph 263 *;
 [A]WO0231701  (UNITED VIDEO PROPERTIES INC [US]) [A] 1,7 * page 12, line 24 - page 14, line 25 * * page 20, line 11 - line 32 *;
 [A]US2001039656  (NAKAMURA ATSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 7 * page 3, paragraph 27 - page 6, paragraph 70 *;
 [A]US2002100052  (DANIELS JOHN J [US]) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph 62 - paragraph 63 * * page 16, paragraph 143 * * page 23, paragraph 210 *;
 [A]WO0193588  (MINERVA NETWORKS INC [US]) [A] 1,4,7,10 * page 12, line 20 - page 14, line 27 *;
 [A]WO0232140  (UNITED VIDEO PROPERTIES INC [US]) [A] 7 * page 18, line 3 - page 28, line 6 *;
 [A]WO0176249  (UNITED VIDEO PROPERTIES INC [US]) [A] 7 * page 6, line 1 - page 15, line 27 *
International search[AE]US2004006698  (APFELBAUM MARC J [US]);
 [AP]US6598228  (HEJNA JR DONALD J [US]);
 [A]WO9848566  (GEMSTAR DEV CORP [US], et al);
 [AE]US6642939  (VALLONE ROBERT [US], et al);
 [A]US5974217  (HARAGUCHI HIDEO [JP])