Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1530526

EP1530526 - CIRCUIT FOR SELECTIVELY PRODUCING SWITCHING SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/20]CIRCUIT FOR SELECTIVELY PRODUCING SWITCHING SIGNALS, IN PARTICULAR SIGNALS USED FOR LOCKING VEHICLE DOORS, A VEHICLE PROVIDED WITH SAID CIRCUIT, A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROTECTING AREAS OF RISK AND A SYSTEM, COMPONENTS AND METHOD FOR HERMETICALLY TRANSFERRING VALIDATABLE DATA
[2008/25]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.08.2009
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ident Technology AG
Hubertusstrasse 38
82131 Gauting / DE
[2005/20]
Inventor(s)01 / DONAT, Stefan
Rieder Strasse 6
82211 Herrsching / DE
02 / RICHTER, Wolfgang
Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 36
82110 Germering / DE
03 / ROSENBECK, Peter
Hubertusstrasse 38
82131 Gauting / DE
 [2006/52]
Former [2005/20]01 / DONAT, Stefan
Hohenaschauerstrasse 59
81669 München / DE
02 / RICHTER, Wolfgang
Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 36
82110 Germering / DE
03 / ROSENBECK, Peter
Hubertusstrasse 38
82131 Gauting / DE
Representative(s)Rössig, Rolf
Beck & Rössig
European Patent Attorneys
Cuvilliésstrasse 14
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/20]Rössig, Rolf
Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstrasse 14
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date03750416.418.08.2003
[2005/20]
WO2003EP09136
Priority number, dateDE200213813415.08.2002         Original published format: DE 10238134
DE200310534210.02.2003         Original published format: DE 10305342
DE200310534110.02.2003         Original published format: DE 10305341
DE200311584508.04.2003         Original published format: DE 10315845
[2005/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004078536
Date:16.09.2004
Language:DE
[2004/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1530526
Date:18.05.2005
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004
[2005/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1530526
Date:15.10.2008
Language:DE
[2008/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.02.2005
ClassificationInternational:B60R25/00, H04L12/10, G07C9/00, H04B13/00
[2005/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/20]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR SELEKTIVEN SCHALTSIGNALGENERIERUNG[2008/25]
English:CIRCUIT FOR SELECTIVELY PRODUCING SWITCHING SIGNALS[2008/25]
French:CIRCUIT DE PRODUCTION SELECTIVE DE SIGNAUX DE COMMUTATION[2008/25]
Former [2005/20]SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR SELEKTIVEN SCHALTSIGNALGENERIERUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE FAHRZEUGTÜRVERRIEGELUNG, HIERMIT AUSGESTATTETES FAHRZEUG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABSICHERUNG VON GEFÄHRDUNGSBEREICHEN SOWIE SYSTEM, SYSTEMKOMPONENTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABWICKLUNG EINES HERMETISCH VALIDIERBAREN DATENTRANSFERS
Former [2005/20]CIRCUIT FOR SELECTIVELY PRODUCING SWITCHING SIGNALS, IN PARTICULAR SIGNALS USED FOR LOCKING VEHICLE DOORS, A VEHICLE PROVIDED WITH SAID CIRCUIT, A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROTECTING AREAS OF RISK AND A SYSTEM, COMPONENTS AND METHOD FOR HERMETICALLY TRANSFERRING VALIDATABLE DATA
Former [2005/20]CIRCUIT DE PRODUCTION SELECTIVE DE SIGNAUX DE COMMUTATION NOTAMMENT DESTINE AU VERROUILLAGE DES PORTIERES D'UN VEHICULE, VEHICULE AINSI EQUIPE, SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE SECURISATION DE ZONES A RISQUES ET SYSTEME, COMPOSANTS SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE MISE EN OEUVRE D'UN TRANSFERT DE DONNEES VALIDABLE HERMET
Entry into regional phase15.03.2005National basic fee paid 
24.08.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.08.2005Examination requested  [2005/43]
24.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2008Fee for grant paid
24.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
01.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IE15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
GR16.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
HU16.04.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/31]CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IE15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
GR16.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
HU16.04.2009
Former [2010/48]CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IE15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
GR16.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/43]CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IE15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/39]CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IE15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/36]DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IE15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/34]DK15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IE15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/26]FI15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/23]BG15.01.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]US5811897  (KRANAWETTER CHRISTIAN ET AL) [X] 1,2,5-8,17,18,21,23-30,32-36 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 7 * * column 4, line 1 - line 42 * * column 5, line 1 - line 24; figure . *;
 [XY]EP1168678  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1,2,4-8,11-13,17-19,23-29,32-36 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0031]; figure - * [Y] 14;
 [X]EP1033687  (ALT ECKHARD ;JAEKEL JUERGEN (US)) [X] 1,2,4-8,11-13,17,18,21,23-29,32-36 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0032] *;
 [YA]US6211799  (NIVI BABAK ET AL) [Y] 14 * abstract * * column 1, line 39 - line 50 * * column 2, line 28 - line 35 * * column 3, line 4 - line 18 * * column 3, line 56 - line 65 * [A] 13,26