Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1537296

EP1537296 - GAS TURBINE SEALING AIR SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.01.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
[2013/23]
Former [2005/23]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YURI, Masanori, @c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD
TAKASAGO Machinery Works
1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome
Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
02 / LAURELLO, Vincent, @ c/o Mitsubishi Power Systems, Inc.
Miami Office, One Datran Center,
9100 South Dadeland Blvd
Suite 1600
Miami, FL 33156 / US
03 / HADA Satoshi, @c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
TAKASAGO Machinery Works
1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome
Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
 [2013/22]
Former [2005/23]01 / YURI, Masanori, Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd
Takasago Mach. Works, 2-1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama
Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-8686 / JP
02 / LAURELLO, Vincent, Mitsubishi Power Systems, Inc.
One Datran Ctr, Suite 1600, 9100 S.Dadeland Blvd
Miami, FL 33156 / US
03 / HADA Satoshi, Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd
Takasago Mach. Works, 2-1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama
Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-8686 / JP
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/23]Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Former [2005/23]Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date03751268.811.09.2003
[2005/23]
WO2003JP11657
Priority number, dateUS2002023865111.09.2002         Original published format: US 238651
[2005/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004025086
Date:25.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1537296
Date:08.06.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004
[2005/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1537296
Date:05.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:F01D5/08, F02C7/18, F01D11/02
[2005/23]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2006/01]
Former [2005/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:DICHTUNGSLUFTVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM IN EINER GASTURBINE[2005/23]
English:GAS TURBINE SEALING AIR SUPPLY SYSTEM[2005/23]
French:SYSTEME D'ACHEMINEMENT D'AIR D'ETANCHEITE DANS UNE TURBINE A GAZ[2005/23]
Entry into regional phase09.03.2005National basic fee paid 
09.03.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
09.03.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/23]
16.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2013Fee for grant paid
17.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.08.2005
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.03.2014  09.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [2017/48]
Former [2014/15]
Opponent(s)01  04.03.2014   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
16.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.01.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.01.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition16.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0650/17
15.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.08.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
30.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
28.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB11.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
FR30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
[2014/37]
Former [2014/34]GB11.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[XY]US3989410  (FERRARI BARTOLOMEO JOSEPH) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 12 * [Y] 3;
 [Y]EP1079067  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028] * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US4466239  (HARRIS ROBERT W ET AL) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 21 - line 47 *;
 [A]US4708588  (SCHWARZ FREDERICK M ET AL) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 2 *;
 [A]US5402636  (MIZE CHRISTOPHER D ET AL) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1194663  (SULZER BROS) [A] 3 * figures 1,2 *