Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1550444 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1550444



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 369
02.07.2019 Closing of application Search / examination 2
02.04.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
26.10.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
26.10.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.09.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
31.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.08.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 18
29.08.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.06.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
12.06.2018 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 3
21.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Claims Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Claims Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Claims Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Claims Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Claims Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Claims Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Claims Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Claims Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Claims Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Claims Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Claims Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Claims Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Claims Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
21.03.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
09.03.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
01.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.01.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
22.01.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.05.2017 Submission concerning representation Appeal 2
07.02.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
28.11.2016 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Appeal 1
23.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.11.2016 Request for correction of client data Appeal 1
17.11.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
10.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.11.2016 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Appeal 2
04.11.2016 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
28.09.2016 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
13.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.09.2016 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 1
13.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.09.2016 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 2
21.07.2014 Submission concerning representation Appeal 2
06.05.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
22.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.04.2014 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 8
22.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.04.2014 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Appeal 2
19.11.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
09.08.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
02.08.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
31.07.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
31.07.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.07.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.07.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
30.07.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
26.07.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
29.05.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
25.05.2012 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
25.05.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
04.04.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.04.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.04.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
30.03.2012 Annex to a communication Search / examination 9
30.03.2012 Annex to a communication Search / examination 13
30.03.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
30.03.2012 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
30.03.2012 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
30.03.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 8
30.03.2012 Means of redress Search / examination 2
30.03.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
30.03.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
30.03.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
30.03.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.03.2012 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 3
26.03.2012 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 3
24.02.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
24.02.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.02.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
21.02.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.02.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 6
13.02.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 6
15.10.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
13.10.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.10.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
12.10.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
12.10.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.10.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
23.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
23.05.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
23.05.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
23.05.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
02.05.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.04.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.12.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
20.12.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.12.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
10.12.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
10.12.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
09.12.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
09.12.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
09.12.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
09.08.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
09.08.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.07.2010 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
10.06.2010 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
10.06.2010 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
26.05.2010 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 2
11.05.2010 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
23.04.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.04.2010 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
06.11.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
25.05.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
10.05.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
08.04.2005 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.04.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
08.04.2005 Description Search / examination 12
08.04.2005 Drawings Search / examination 2
08.04.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.04.2005 Translation of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
30.03.2005 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
11.02.2005 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
14.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 7
01.01.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
01.01.2004 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
01.01.2004 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 15