Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1551550

EP1551550 - NICKEL CATALYST FOR HYDROGENATION REACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.07.2010
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Corporation
100 Campus Drive
Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US
[2010/41]
Former [2005/28]For all designated states
ENGELHARD CORPORATION
101 Wood Avenue
Iselin, New Jersey 08830-0770 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BERBEN, Pieter, Hildegardus
Vinkenbuurt 12
NL-3951 CZ Maarn / NL
02 / REKKER, Tjalling
Marga Klompéstraat 4
NL-4105 JD Culemborg / NL
 [2005/28]
Representative(s)Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/42]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
Vereenigde
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Former [2008/34]Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F. , et al
Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Former [2005/28]Winckels, J.H.F., Mr. Ir. , et al
Vereenigde, Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date03754310.517.10.2003
[2005/28]
WO2003NL00705
Priority number, dateEP2002007936218.10.2002         Original published format: EP 02079362
[2005/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004035204
Date:29.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1551550
Date:13.07.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004
[2005/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:B01J23/78, B01J33/00, B01J35/02, B01J37/03, C11C3/12
[2005/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/28]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NICKEL-KATALYSATOR FÜR HYDRIERREAKTIONEN[2005/28]
English:NICKEL CATALYST FOR HYDROGENATION REACTIONS[2005/28]
French:CATALYSEUR A BASE DE NICKEL UTILISE DANS DES REACTIONS D'HYDROGENATION[2005/28]
Entry into regional phase08.04.2005National basic fee paid 
08.04.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.04.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/28]
25.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.02.2017
07.02.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
08.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination06.07.2017Appeal received No.  T2323/17
06.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
20.12.2019Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP17150536.5  / EP3195931
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.02.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
02.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
02.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
31.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
31.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
02.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
31.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
02.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
31.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
31.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 17
Cited inInternational search[XDY]EP1101530  (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [XD] 1,3-8,10-16,18,19,26 * paragraphs [0001] , [0019] , [0020] * * example 3 * [Y] 2,9,13,17;
 [XY]US4532351  (BARNETT ALLAN E [US], et al) [X] 1,3-8,10-16,18-26 * examples 5,6 * * claim 1 * * column 6, line 46 - line 59 * [Y] 2,9,13,17;
 [XY]US4631265  (OUDEJANS JOHANNES C [NL], et al) [X] 1,3-8,10-14,19-26 * table I * * column 3, line 35 - line 40 * * column 3, line 48 - line 54 * [Y] 2,9,13;
 [XY]US5616531  (FELDHAUSER BRIGITTE [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-8,10-14,19-26 * column 2, line 47 - line 61 * [Y] 2,9,13;
 [XY]EP0597662  (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [X] 1,4,8,10-13,19-24,26 * page 2, line 56 - line 58 * * page 3, line 20 - line 44 * * example - * [Y] 2,9,13;
 [Y]WO9530481  (ENGELHARD CORP [US], et al) [Y] 2,9,13,17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE2850719  (WINSEL AUGUST PROF DIPL PHYS D) [Y] 2,9,13,17 * the whole document *