blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1552447 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1552447



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 544
22.08.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
26.10.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.09.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.09.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.09.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
04.09.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
06.06.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.06.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 4
06.06.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
23.05.2017 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Search / examination 1
02.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.04.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 20
27.04.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 20
27.04.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.04.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
06.12.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.12.2016 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 4
11.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.11.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
28.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
28.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
28.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
28.10.2016 Claims Appeal 6
28.10.2016 Claims Appeal 5
28.10.2016 Claims Appeal 5
28.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
05.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.08.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
31.08.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
30.08.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
28.06.2016 General enquiry Appeal 1
04.01.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
11.12.2015 General enquiry Appeal 1
25.08.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
20.08.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 28
20.08.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
20.08.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
20.08.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
20.08.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
20.08.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 33
04.02.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
13.12.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.02.2013 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
04.02.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.11.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
07.07.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.06.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
21.06.2011 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
21.06.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
30.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
30.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
30.05.2011 Claims Appeal 5
30.05.2011 Claims Appeal 5
30.05.2011 Claims Appeal 4
30.05.2011 Description Appeal 2
30.05.2011 Description Appeal 2
30.05.2011 Description Appeal 2
30.05.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
24.05.2011 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
24.05.2011 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
31.03.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
25.01.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
25.01.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
21.01.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 16
21.01.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
21.01.2011 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
21.01.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 12
21.01.2011 Means of redress Search / examination 2
21.01.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
15.11.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
09.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
09.11.2010 Annex Search / examination 1
09.11.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
09.11.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
09.11.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 10
12.07.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
10.07.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.07.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
08.07.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.07.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.12.2009 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.11.2009 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
21.11.2008 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.11.2008 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.11.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.11.2008 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
18.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
18.11.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.10.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.07.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
08.07.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.06.2008 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
24.06.2008 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
18.01.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
27.11.2007 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
09.11.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.11.2007 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
08.08.2007 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
03.08.2007 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
14.06.2007 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
15.05.2007 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
14.12.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
20.11.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
14.11.2006 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
01.11.2006 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
19.09.2006 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
22.08.2006 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
20.04.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.04.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
13.03.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
01.06.2005 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.03.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
15.02.2005 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.02.2005 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
26.01.2005 Invitation to pay the shortfall after fee increase Search / examination 1
11.01.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
29.10.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.06.2004 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
20.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
24.12.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
24.12.2003 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 25