blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1552447


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
22.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
08.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
24.08.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
27.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
15.09.2017 (Expected) grant published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
13.09.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
13.09.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.09.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
15.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.06.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.06.2017 Change - inventor
02.06.2017 Change - classification published on  05.07.2017  [2017/27]
02.06.2017 Change - classification published on  05.07.2017  [2017/27]
05.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.12.2016 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
30.08.2016 Change: Date of oral proceedings
30.08.2016 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.06.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.10.2015 Change - divisional application(s) published on  25.11.2015  [2015/48]
09.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.06.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.06.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.06.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.07.2011 Change: Appeal number
17.06.2011 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
17.06.2011 Change - representative published on  20.07.2011  [2011/29]
10.06.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.04.2011 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
05.04.2011 New entry: Appeal number
18.01.2011 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.01.2011 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
01.10.2010 Change - divisional application(s) published on  03.11.2010  [2010/44]
06.07.2010 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
02.06.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.06.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.11.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.07.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.07.2008 First examination report
06.06.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.11.2007 Supplementary search report published on  12.12.2007  [2007/50]
10.08.2007 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
10.08.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.07.2007 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
29.12.2006 Change - inventor published on  31.01.2007  [2007/05]
01.12.2006 Change - inventor published on  03.01.2007  [2007/01]
05.04.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.08.2005 Change - extension states published on  05.10.2005  [2005/40]
27.05.2005 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.07.2005  [2005/28]
27.05.2005 Request for examination filed published on  13.07.2005  [2005/28]
23.05.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
20.05.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
06.04.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.02.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
09.02.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
21.01.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
28.02.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
08.01.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
07.01.2004 PCT data prior to European publication