blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1552447 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP03760289 EP10183825 EP15002933



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014156532Global Dossier 05.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201213423557 19.03.2012
US38809402 12.06.2002
US72085710 10.03.2010
US201414176570 10.02.2014
US41982906 23.05.2006
US45984903 12.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014108250Global Dossier 17.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314026209 13.09.2013
US95980910 03.12.2010
US38809402 12.06.2002
US72085710 10.03.2010
US41982906 23.05.2006
US45984903 12.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014089194Global Dossier 27.03.2014A1
Priority number Date
US95980910 03.12.2010
US38809402 12.06.2002
US72085710 10.03.2010
US41982906 23.05.2006
US201314026232 13.09.2013
US45984903 12.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014081863Global Dossier 20.03.2014A1
Priority number Date
US95980910 03.12.2010
US38809402 12.06.2002
US72085710 10.03.2010
US201314026197 13.09.2013
US41982906 23.05.2006
US45984903 12.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8650118Global Dossier 11.02.2014B2
US2012197760 02.08.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201213423557 19.03.2012
US38809402 12.06.2002
US72085710 10.03.2010
US41982906 23.05.2006
US45984903 12.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8645266Global Dossier 04.02.2014B2
US2011167002 07.07.2011A1
Priority number Date
US95980910 03.12.2010
US38809402 12.06.2002
US72085710 10.03.2010
US41982906 23.05.2006
US45984903 12.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8140429Global Dossier 20.03.2012B2
US2010169215 01.07.2010A1
Priority number Date
US38809402 12.06.2002
US72085710 10.03.2010
US41982906 23.05.2006
US45984903 12.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7693783Global Dossier 06.04.2010B2
US2006282382 14.12.2006A1
Priority number Date
US38809402 12.06.2002
US41982906 23.05.2006
US45984903 12.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7051002Global Dossier 23.05.2006B2
US2003233327 18.12.2003A1
Priority number Date
US38809402 12.06.2002
US45984903 12.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2998914Global Dossier 23.03.2016A1
Priority number Date
US38809402 12.06.2002
EP03760289 12.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2284784Global Dossier 13.12.2017B1
EP2284784 16.02.2011A1
Priority number Date
US38809402 12.06.2002
EP03760289 12.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2950637Global Dossier 19.03.2019C
CA2950637 24.12.2003A1
Priority number Date
CA2492715 12.06.2003
US38809402 12.06.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2492715Global Dossier 06.12.2016C
CA2492715 24.12.2003A1
Priority number Date
US38809402 12.06.2002
US0318531 12.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1552447Global Dossier 18.10.2017B1
EP1552447 12.12.2007A4
EP1552447 13.07.2005A1
Priority number Date
US38809402 12.06.2002
US0318531 12.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003243523B 10.04.2008B2
AU2003243523 31.12.2003A1
Priority number Date
US38809402 12.06.2002
US0318531 12.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2651844T 30.01.2018T3
Priority number Date
US38809402 12.06.2002
US0318531 12.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA200500269 28.09.2005B
Priority number Date
US38809402 12.06.2002
US0318531 12.06.2003
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO03107242Global Dossier 24.12.2003A1
Priority number Date
US38809402 12.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2659723T 19.03.2018T3
Priority number Date
US38809402 12.06.2002
TypeType Divisional application
 EP2284784
 EP2998914