Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1552447

EP1552447 - UNIVERSAL MERCHANT PLATFORM FOR PAYMENT AUTHENTICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CardinalCommerce Corporation
6119 Heisley Road
Mentor, OH 44060-1837 / US
[2017/42]
Former [2005/28]For all designated states
Cardinalcommerce Corporation
6119 Heisley Road
Mentor, OH 44060-1837 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KERESMAN, Michael, A.
8890 Cardinal Drive
Kirtland Hills, OH 44060-1837 / US
02 / SHERWIN, Francis, M.
2183 North St. James Parkway
Cleveland Heights, OH 44106 / US
03 / BALASUBRAMANIAN, Chandra, S.
1390 Ethel Avenue
Lakewood, OH 44107 / US
 [2017/42]
Former [2007/05]01 / KERESMAN, Michael, A.
8890 Cardinal Drive
Kirtland Hills, OH 44060-1837 / US
02 / SHERWIN, Francis, M.
2183 North St. James Parkway
Cleveland Heights, OH 44106 / US
03 / BALASUBRAMANIAN, Chandra, S.
1390 Ehtel Avenue
Lakewood, OH 44107 / US
Former [2007/01]01 / KERESMAN, Michael, A.
8890 Cardinal Drive
Kirtland Hills, OH 44060-1837 / US
02 / SHERWIN, Francis, M.
3377 East Monmouth Road
Cleveland Heights, OH 44118 / US
03 / BALASUBRAMANIAN, Chandra, S.
1390 Ehtel Avenue
Lakewood, OH 44107 / US
Former [2005/28]01 / KERESMAN, Michael, A.
8890 Cardinal Drive
Kirtland Hills, OH 44060-1837 / US
02 / SHERWIN, Francis, M.
3377 East Monmouth Road
Cleveland Heights, OH 44118 / US
03 / BALASUBRAMANIAN, Chandra, S.
5779 South Winds Drive, Apt. 77
Mentor-on-the-lake, OH 44060 / US
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB , et al
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2017/42]
Former [2011/29]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte , et al
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Former [2005/28]Held, Stephan, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 03 29
81630 München / DE
Application number, filing date03760289.312.06.2003
[2005/28]
WO2003US18531
Priority number, dateUS20020388094P12.06.2002         Original published format: US 388094 P
[2005/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03107242
Date:24.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1552447
Date:13.07.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003
[2005/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1552447
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.12.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/08, G06Q20/02, G06Q20/12, G06Q20/40
[2017/27]
Former International [2005/28]G06F17/60
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/42]
Former [2005/28]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:UNIVERSELLE HÄNDLERPLATTFORM FÜR DIE BEZAHLUNGSAUTHENTIFIKATION[2005/28]
English:UNIVERSAL MERCHANT PLATFORM FOR PAYMENT AUTHENTICATION[2005/28]
French:PLATE-FORME COMMERCIALE UNIVERSELLE POUR UNE AUTHENTIFICATION DE PAIEMENT[2005/28]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2005National basic fee paid 
11.01.2005Search fee paid 
11.01.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.01.2005Examination requested  [2005/28]
08.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2010Date of oral proceedings
21.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
21.01.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
06.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
07.09.2017Fee for grant paid
07.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination31.03.2011Appeal received No.  T1463/11
30.05.2011Statement of grounds filed
29.11.2016Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
29.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP10183825.8  / EP2284784
EP15002933.8  / EP2998914
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.07.2008
Opposition(s)19.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
05.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
24.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
07.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
07.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
07.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
06.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
05.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
07.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
07.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200705   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
LU12.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/21]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
LU12.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
Former [2019/17]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
LU12.06.2018
Former [2019/15]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
Former [2018/42]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
Former [2018/35]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
Former [2018/22]FI18.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1134707  (TRADESAFELY COM LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0042] - [0060] , [0061] *;
 [X]US2001032878  (TSIOUNIS YIANNIS S [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0033] , [0090] - [0096] *;
 [X]EP1107198  (CITIBANK NA [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0042] - [0060] , [0061] *;
 [X]WO0146918  (ARCOT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 8, line 14 - page 10, line 20 * * page 11, line 24 - line 29 *
International search[A]US6070150  ;
 [A]US5884288  ;
 [A]JPS6079466